Maryland District Court
Case #: 8:23-cr-00092
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2023
Last checked: Friday Mar 17, 2023 3:55 AM EDT
Defendant
John Joseph Behun (1)
Represented By
Rosana E Chavez
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Geonard Flay Butler, II
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Kelly OConnell Hayes
Office Of The United States Attorney
contact info

GPO Nov 17 2023
MEMORANDUM ORDER directing that Counsel for Behun shall file, within the next 30 days, a brief stating the factual and legal grounds supporting their position that Behun's consent is necessary before Probation and the Court may obtain and consider his tax returns as to John Joseph Behun. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/17/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 03/17/2023 4:24 AM EDT
Friday, August 20, 2021
1 1 SEALED CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to John Joseph Behun (1). (mtds, Deputy Clerk) [8:21-mj-02411-TJS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
3 3 Government's Motion to Seal and Order GRANTING same as to John Joseph Behun Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 8/20/2021. (mtds, Deputy Clerk) [8:21-mj-02411-TJS]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 27, 2021
4 4 Motion to Unseal and Order GRANTING same as to John Joseph Behun. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 8/27/2021. (ts2s, Deputy Clerk) [8:21-mj-02411-TJS]
Related: [-]
5 5 Initial Appearance as to John Joseph Behun (Defendant informed of Rights.) held on 8/27/2021 before Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms.(FTR - Singletary - 2A) (ts2s, Deputy Clerk) [8:21-mj-02411-TJS]
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by John Joseph Behun (ts2s, Deputy Clerk) [8:21-mj-02411-TJS]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to John Joseph Behun. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 8/27/2021. (ts2s, Deputy Clerk) [8:21-mj-02411-TJS]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Pursuant to Fed R Crim P 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act as to John Joseph Behun. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 8/27/2021. (ts2s, Deputy Clerk) [8:21-mj-02411-TJS]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to John Joseph Behun. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 8/27/2021. (ts2s, Deputy Clerk) [8:21-mj-02411-TJS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
10 10 Receipt for Surrender of Passport as to John Joseph Behun (jj2, Deputy Clerk) [8:21-mj-02411-TJS]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Rosana E Chavez as Public Defender appearing for John Joseph Behun(Chavez, Rosana) [8:21-mj-02411-TJS]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
12 12 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 08/27/2021 in case as to John Joseph Behun - Related [+] (mtds, Deputy Clerk) [8:21-mj-02411-TJS]
Related: [-] ceived for docketing on 9/3/2021
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
14 14 Status Conference as to John Joseph Behun held on 11/1/2022 before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Information to be filed and referred to district judge by clerk's office. (jmm, Chambers) [8:21-mj-02411-TJS]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
15 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Kelly OConnell Hayes appearing for USA.(Hayes, Kelly) [8:21-mj-02411-TJS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
16 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Geonard Flay Butler, II appearing for USA.(Butler, Geonard) [8:21-mj-02411-TJS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
17 17 INFORMATION as to John Joseph Behun (1) count(s) 1. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]