Nevada District Court
Judge:Andrew P Gordon
Referred: Cam Ferenbach
Case #: 2:23-cv-00414
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2023
Terminated:Aug 14, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 3:14 AM PDT
Defendant
Las Vegas-CJD, LLC
Represented By
Anthony L. Martin
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Elody Clementine Tignor
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Shawna Christion
Represented By
Kathryn Bain
Bain Mazza & Debski LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, August 14, 2023
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 08/15 10:17 AM
ORDER granting23 and24 Stipulation for Dismissal of Entire Action. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND REQUESTED by and between the parties here to through their respective attorneys of record that this entire action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each side bearing its own costs and attorneys fees, except as otherwise provided in the parties settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
24 24 motion Stipulation Fri 08/11 12:05 PM
Joint STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Plaintiff Shawna Christion. (Bain, Kathryn) (dismissal)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Stipulation Fri 08/11 11:49 AM
Joint STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Plaintiff Shawna Christion. (Bain, Kathryn) (dismissal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Thu 07/06 9:11 AM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Early Neutral Evaluation session held on 7/5/2023 before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. Crtrm Administrator: J. Ries ; Pla Counsel: Kathryn Bain ; Def Counsel: Anthony Martin and Elody Tignor ; Recording start and end times: 10:05 - 1:35 ; Courtroom: 3A ; Also present were Shawna Christion and Kara Southard. The court heard presentations from counsel and the parties present and met with each side in caucuses. A settlement was reached and is SEALED. The parties are to execute settlement documents and file dismissal paperwork by September 5, 2023. If a stipulated dismissal has not been filed by September 5, 2023, the parties are instructed to submit a joint status report outlining what is impeding settlement and how or if the court can assist. The joint status report should be submitted directly to the chambers of the Honorable Daniel J. Albregts, at fax number : (702) 464-5576. DO NOT DELIVER OR MAIL THE REPORT TO THE CLERKS OFFICE OR E-FILE THE REPORT IN CM/ECF. This requirement for a joint status report shall be automatically vacated if dismissal paperwork is filed beforehand. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
21 21 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 06/16 3:20 PM
ORDER Granting20 Motion Request for Exception to Attendance of Insurance Carrier at ENE Session. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 6/15/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
20 20 motion Motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 06/12 12:42 PM
MOTION Request for Exception to Attendance of Insurance Carrier at ENE Session Set for July 5, 2023 by Defendant Las Vegas-CJD, LLC. Responses due by 6/26/2023. (Tignor, Elody) (misc) (settlement)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
minord Minute Order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/25 5:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 5/25/2023. Before the Court is Defendant's Motion for Exception to In-Person Attendance at Early Neutral Evaluation Session Set for July 5, 2023. (ECF No. 15 ). For good cause appearing therein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion 15 is GRANTED. Defendant's representative may appear remotely through video. The court will provide an email with a link to appear via Zoom video in advance of the ENE. Ms. Southard must use this link to appear during the court's initial introduction. However, once individual caucuses begin, defendant's counsel will be required to establish a remote connection through a personal laptop or cellular telephone so that Ms. Southard may participate in the individual caucus. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for Defendant shall include the email address of the representative in its evaluation statement. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
17 17 6 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Tue 05/23 4:06 PM
ORDER Granting16 Stipulated Discovery Plan. Discovery due by 10/4/2023. Motions due by 11/3/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/4/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/23/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Tue 05/23 4:07 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (AMMi)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
16 16 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Mon 05/22 10:25 AM
Proposed Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Las Vegas-CJD, LLC.. (Tignor, Elody)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
15 15 motion Motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/10 3:23 PM
MOTION Requesting Exception to In-Person Attendance at ENE Session by Defendant Las Vegas-CJD, LLC. Responses due by 5/24/2023. (Tignor, Elody) (misc) (settlement)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/09 4:24 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Las Vegas-CJD, LLC.(Tignor, Elody)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
13 13 4 pgs order Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session Wed 05/03 9:47 AM
ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 7/5/2023 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 5/2/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Stipulation Tue 04/18 11:57 AM
ORDER Granting10 Stipulation to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Second Cause of Action for Retaliation be dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's Fourth Cause of Action for Tortious Discharge be dismissed with prejudice. Defendant hereby withdraws its Motion for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Second and Fourth Causes of Action9 as it is now moot. Defendant will file an Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint within 21 days of the Court granting this Order. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/18/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
11 11 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 04/14 2:58 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Las Vegas-CJD, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Tignor, Elody)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
10 10 motion Stipulation Thu 04/13 4:34 PM
STIPULATION TO DISMISS Plaintiff's Second and Fourth Causes of Action re1 Complaint, by Defendant Las Vegas-CJD, LLC. (Tignor, Elody) (dismiss)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
9 9 motion Motion Dismiss Fri 04/07 3:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint, by Defendant Las Vegas-CJD, LLC. Responses due by 4/21/2023. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/17/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/22/2023. (Tignor, Elody)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
8 8 service Certificate of Service Fri 03/24 2:47 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for7 Summons Issued,3 Proposed Summons to be issued,4 Certificate of Interested Parties,1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Shawna Christion.. (Bain, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 03/17 11:04 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Las Vegas-CJD, LLC. (LOE)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 03/17 10:59 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (LOE)
Related: [-]
order Standing Order Fri 03/17 11:00 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
Related: [-]
notice ENE Notice Fri 03/17 11:02 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (LOE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
4 4 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 03/16 6:46 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Shawna Christion. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bain, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Proposed Summons to be issued Thu 03/16 6:44 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Shawna Christion. (Bain, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Civil Cover Sheet Thu 03/16 6:42 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET to1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Shawna Christion. (Bain, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/16 6:40 PM
COMPLAINT against Las Vegas-CJD, LLC dba Sahara Chrysler Dodge Ram (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7238594) by Shawna Christion. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/26/2023. Proof of service due by 6/14/2023. (Bain, Kathryn)
Related: [-]