Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:John A Gibney, Jr
Referred: Roderick C Young
Case #: 3:14-cv-00682
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2014
Terminated:Sep 26, 2016
Last checked: Thursday May 14, 2015 1:31 PM EDT
Defendant
Genworth Financial, Inc.
Represented By
Robert Samuel Ruff, III
Weil Gotshal & Manges Llp (ny-Na)
contact info
Brian Emory Pumphrey
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Caroline Hickey Zalka
Weil Gotshal & Manges Llp (ny-Na)
contact info
Ryan David Frei
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Greg A. Danilow
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Defendant
Martin P. Klein
Represented By
Robert Samuel Ruff, III
Weil Gotshal & Manges Llp (ny-Na)
contact info
Brian Emory Pumphrey
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Caroline Hickey Zalka
Weil Gotshal & Manges Llp (ny-Na)
contact info
Ryan David Frei
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Greg A. Danilow
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Defendant
Thomas J. McInerney
Represented By
Robert Samuel Ruff, III
Weil Gotshal & Manges Llp (ny-Na)
contact info
Brian Emory Pumphrey
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Caroline Hickey Zalka
Weil Gotshal & Manges Llp (ny-Na)
contact info
Ryan David Frei
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Greg A. Danilow
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
City of Pontiac General Employees' Retirement System
Represented By
Susan Rebbeca Podolsky
The Law Offices Of Susan R Podolsky
contact info
Plaintiff
Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association
Represented By
David Ronald Stickney
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann Llp (na-Ca)
contact info
Avi Josefson
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP
contact info
Blair Allen Nicholas
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann Llp (na-Ca)
contact info
Brandon Marsh
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann Llp (na-Ca)
contact info
Susan Rebbeca Podolsky
The Law Offices Of Susan R Podolsky
contact info
Gerald Harlan Silk
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP
contact info
Jonathan Daniel Uslaner
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann Llp (na-Ca)
contact info
Plaintiff
Her Majesty The Queen In Right Of Alberta
Represented By
David Ronald Stickney
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann Llp (na-Ca)
contact info
Avi Josefson
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP
contact info
Blair Allen Nicholas
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann Llp (na-Ca)
contact info
Cynthia Hanawalt
Bleichmar Fonti Tountas & Auld LLP
contact info
Stephen William Tountas
Bleichmar Fonti Tountas & Auld LLP
contact info
Dominic James Auld
Bleichmar Fonti Tountas & Auld LLP
contact info
Joseph Alberto Fonti
Bleichmar Fonti Tountas & Auld LLP
contact info
Brandon Marsh
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann Llp (na-Ca)
contact info
Jeffrey Robert Alexander
Bleichmar Fonti Tountas & Auld LLP
contact info
Susan Rebbeca Podolsky
The Law Offices Of Susan R Podolsky
contact info
Gerald Harlan Silk
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP
contact info
Jonathan Daniel Uslaner
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann Llp (na-Ca)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Movant
IWA Forest Industry Pension Plan
Terminated: 11/06/2014
Represented By
Charles E. James, Jr.
Williams Mullen (richmond)
contact info
Movant
Sjunde AP-Fonden
Terminated: 11/06/2014
Represented By
Charles Lewis Williams
Williams & Skilling PC
contact info
Movant
Carlos Viera
Terminated: 11/06/2014
Represented By
Steven Jeffrey Toll
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll Pllc (dc)
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 22, 2018
221 221 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 03/22 10:16 AM
ORDER that Blair A. Nicholas may withdraw as counsel of record for Lead Plaintiffs Her Majesty the Queen in Right of Alberta and Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association in this action. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 3/22/2018. (sbea, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
220 220 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 03/20 11:12 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Permitting Blair A. Nicolas to Withdraw as Counsel of Record by Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Her Majesty The Queen In Right Of Alberta.(Podolsky, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order