Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Richard A Lanzillo
Case #: 1:23-cv-00073
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2023
Terminated:Mar 22, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 8:52 AM EDT
Defendant
HYKU HOME, INC.,
Plaintiff
ANTHONY HAMMOND MURPHY
Represented By
Lawrence H. Fisher
Lawrence Fisher
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, March 22, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Atty) Fri 03/22 3:16 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ANTHONY HAMMOND MURPHY (Fisher, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
4 4 order Status Report Order Wed 03/20 3:09 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER. Counsel for the Plaintiff is hereby directed to file a written status report updating the Court on the continued progression of this litigation. Status Report is due by 4/3/2024. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on March 20, 2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will be issued. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 15, 2023
3 3 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Sat 04/15 8:49 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ANTHONY HAMMOND MURPHY. HYKU HOME, INC., served on 4/4/2023, answer due 4/25/2023. (Fisher, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 03/20 4:06 PM
Summons Issued as to HYKU HOME, INC. (jv)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
1 1 cmp PILOT ATTORNEY Complaint (To be used by filers. Credit card required.) Fri 03/17 10:23 AM
COMPLAINT (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7594724), filed by ANTHONY HAMMOND MURPHY. (Fisher, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons