Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Karen Gren Scholer
Case #: 3:23-cv-00593
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2023
Re-opened:Feb 10, 2025
Terminated:Feb 10, 2025
Case in other court:444th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, TX, DC-23-02071
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 8:20 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Landmark American Insurance Company
Represented By
Blair Kendall Beene
Shackelford, Bowen, Mckinley & Norton, LLP
contact info
Jay W Brown
Shackelford Bowen Mckinley & Norton LLP
contact info
Melissa Arvizu
Shackelford Bowen Mckinley & Norton LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Trinity Meadows Owners Association Inc
Represented By
Robert Dale Green
Green Klein & Wood
contact info
Hunter Milam Klein
Green Klein & Wood
contact info
Delaram Falsafi
Green Klein & Wood
contact info
Yulia Houghtaling
Gauthier Murphy & Houghtaling LLC
contact info
Defendant
Landmark American Insurance Company
Represented By
Blair Kendall Beene
Shackelford, Bowen, Mckinley & Norton, LLP
contact info
Jay W Brown
Shackelford Bowen Mckinley & Norton LLP
contact info
Melissa Arvizu
Shackelford Bowen Mckinley & Norton LLP
contact info
Mediator
ADR Provider
Represented By
Greg Thompson
Thompson Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Trinity Meadows Owners Association Inc
Represented By
Robert Dale Green
Green Klein & Wood
contact info
Hunter Milam Klein
Green Klein & Wood
contact info
Delaram Falsafi
Green Klein & Wood
contact info
Yulia Houghtaling
Gauthier Murphy & Houghtaling LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, February 10, 2025
75 75 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Mon 02/10 3:52 PM
ORDER re74 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. The Clerk is directed to REOPEN this case to enable the dismissal of this case with prejudice pursuant to the parties Stipulation. In light of the Stipulation, all claims that each party asserts, or could have asserted, in this lawsuit are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party will bear their own attorney's fees and costs. All relief not expressly granted is DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 2/10/2025) (twd)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
74 74 misc Stipulation Fri 02/07 3:39 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice by Landmark American Insurance Company. (Brown, Jay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order