Sky Harvey v. McGee Air Services, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01993 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jan 11, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Los Angeles County Superior Court, 23STCV03149 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 8:30 AM PDT |
Defendant
Alaska Airlines, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
McGee Air Services Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sky Harvey
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, January 11, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 01/11 1:24 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On January 10, 2024, Plaintiff Sky Harvey and Defendants McGee Air Services, Inc. and Alaska Airlines, Inc. filed a Stipulation fir Dismissal, dismissing the action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)20 . Having considered the Stipulation for Dismissal and finding good cause therefor, the court hereby ORDERS: 1. All dates and deadlines governing this action are VACATED. 2. The court DISMISSES the action with prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 01/10 11:07 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc., McGee Air Services Inc..(Tran, Tiffany) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 01/10 9:46 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING STIPULATION (DKT.18 ) by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court STRIKES the parties' Joint Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice for failure to attest on the signature page of the document that all other signatories listed, who electronically signed with a "s" and on whose behalf the filing is submitted, concur in the content of and have authorized the filing. See Local Rule 5-4.3.4. Any renewed stipulation must comply with all applicable statutes and Local Rules. Failure to comply with all applicable statutes and Local Rules in any renewed stipulation, including Local Rule 5-4.3.4, may result in the denial of the stipulation with prejudice. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
stip
Dismiss Case
Tue 01/09 3:13 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc..(Tran, Tiffany) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 05, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
Fri 01/05 1:37 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))15 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The document is stricken. (lc) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Tue 01/02 11:02 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE:Defendants' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulation: Dismiss Case. MISSING Local Rule 5-4.3.4(a)(2)(i) Attestation Other error(s) with document(s): The pdf document is a Combined Stipulation and Order format, not applicable in e-filing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 12/28 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Defendants Alaska Airlines, Inc., McGee Air Services Inc.. Dismissal is with Prejudice. (Tran, Tiffany) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 05/11 1:55 PM
ORDER RE: SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES, TRIAL REQUIREMENTS, AND CONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha : Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2024 01:00 PM ; Jury Trial set for 11/12/2024 08:30 AM; Motion in Limine set for hearing on 10/25/2024 at 01:00 PM (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL SPECIFIED DEADLINES). (lc) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
Thu 05/11 1:28 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 09/20/2024. (tf) |
|
12 | 12
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 05/11 1:24 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the court VACATES the May 19, 2023, Scheduling Conference. Order re Jury/Court Trial to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Fri 05/05 1:26 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5, filed by Defendants Alaska Airlines, Inc., McGee Air Services Inc... |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Mon 03/20 12:33 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2023 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) |
|
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 03/20 12:29 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Fri 03/17 11:54 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 11:54 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 11:53 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (sh) |
|
5 | 5
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 03/17 10:55 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Alaska Airlines, Inc., McGee Air Services, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on 03/17/2023. |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/17 10:51 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Alaska Airlines, Inc., McGee Air Services, Inc. identifying Alaska Air Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Alaska Airlines, Inc., McGee Air Services, Inc., identifying Sky Harvey, McGee Air Services, Inc., and Alaska Airlines, Inc.. |
|
2 | 2
5
pgs
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 10:46 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Alaska Airlines, Inc., McGee Air Services, Inc.. |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 10:44 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 23STCV03149 Receipt No: ACACDC-34974551 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Alaska Airlines, Inc., McGee Air Services, Inc.. (Attorney Isabella D. Reyes added to party Alaska Airlines, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Isabella D. Reyes added to party McGee Air Services, Inc.(pty:dft)) |
|
Att: 1 23 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 03/17 11:43 AM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Alaska Airlines, Inc., Does, McGee Air Services Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Sky Harvey.[FILED IN STATE COURT 02/14/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Fri 03/17 11:50 AM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Alaska Airlines, Inc., McGee Air Services Inc.[STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO.3 EXHIBIT C TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh) |