Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodney Smith
Referred: Shaniek Mills Maynard
Case #: 9:23-cv-80427
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2023
Terminated:Sep 27, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2023 7:46 AM EDT
Defendant
Palm Bay International, Inc.
Represented By
Paul Fernandez Penichet
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Jodi Nicole Cohen
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Mediator
Dana Gallup
Plaintiff
Melani Henkle
Represented By
Marc A Burton
The Burton Firm
contact info
Richard Jay Burton
Burton Firm (the)
contact info


Docket last updated: 20 minutes ago
Friday, October 20, 2023
29 29 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Fri 10/20 10:01 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Melani Henkle (Burton, Marc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
28 28 1 pgs order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Thu 09/28 7:50 AM
Notice of Court Practice on Notice of Settlement: Parties to File Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by 10/27/2023; Case is Closed. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/27/2023. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
27 27 1 pgs adr Mediation Report Wed 09/27 6:34 PM
FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Mediator Dana M Gallup. Disposition: Settled in full. Filed by Dana Gallup.(Gallup, Dana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
26 26 PAPERLESS ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/12/2023. (tcl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
25 25 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Dana Gallup as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 9/27/2023 at 10:00 a.m.. (Burton, Marc)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
24 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Schedule Mediation re22 Order Referring Case to Mediation by Melani Henkle. Responses due by 9/8/2023 (Burton, Marc)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
23 23 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 9/9/2024 at 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 9/3/2024 at 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 8/11/2023., Expert Discovery due by 4/5/2024., Fact Discovery due by 3/15/2024., Joinder of Parties due by 8/11/2023., Mediation Deadline 3/31/2024., In Limine Motions due by 8/2/2024., Dispositive Motions due by 4/19/2024., Motions due by 8/2/2024., Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/2/2024.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard all motions for attorneys fees, costs, and sanctions, plus all non-dispositive pretrial motions. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/7/2023. See attached document for full details. (mee) [LINK:Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.]
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Mediation Deadline 3/31/2024. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/7/2023. See attached document for full details. (mee)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
21 21 Joint Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge signed by all parties (as to Discovery only) . Filed by Palm Bay International, Inc. (Penichet, Paul)
Related: [-]
20 20 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Palm Bay International, Inc.(Penichet, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, June 16, 2023
19 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to file Joint Scheduling Report by June 26, 2023 . Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/16/2023. (tcl)
Related: [-]
Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Report due by 6/26/2023 per d.e. 19 Order. (mee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
18 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for the Parties to File Joint Scheduling Report re13 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, by Palm Bay International, Inc.. Responses due by 6/20/2023(Penichet, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, June 01, 2023
17 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re11 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Strike Immaterial Matters filed by Palm Bay International, Inc.. (Penichet, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
16 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Motion to Dismiss. Defendant shall file its Reply by 6/1/2023. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/26/2023. (tcl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
15 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to14 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Palm Bay International, Inc..(Penichet, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, May 18, 2023
14 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re11 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Strike Immaterial Matters filed by Melani Henkle. Replies due by 5/25/2023.(Burton, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Screenshot of Cavit Wines Website,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Jason Sabo LinkedIn Page
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
13 13 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS. Joint Scheduling Report,Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements due by 6/6/2023. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/16/2023. See attached document for full details. (mee)
Related: [-]
12 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/16/2023. (tcl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
11 11 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Strike Immaterial Matters by Palm Bay International, Inc.. Responses due by 5/23/2023(Penichet, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EEOC CHARGE
Monday, May 08, 2023
10 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Palm Bay International, Inc..(Penichet, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
9 9 NOTICE by Melani Henkle re8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal (Notice of Filing Amended Complaint with Consent of Defendant) (Burton, Marc)
Related: [-]
8 8 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Palm Bay International, Inc., filed by Melani Henkle.(Burton, Marc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
7 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Fernandez Penichet on behalf of Palm Bay International, Inc.. Attorney Paul Fernandez Penichet added to party Palm Bay International, Inc.(pty:dft). (Penichet, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
6 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting5 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint. Defendant Palm Bay International, Inc. shall file its Response/Answer by Wednesday April 26, 2023 . Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/12/2023. (tcl)
Related: [-]
5 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Palm Bay International, Inc.. Attorney Jodi Nicole Cohen added to party Palm Bay International, Inc.(pty:dft).(Cohen, Jodi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
4 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Melani Henkle. Palm Bay International, Inc. served on 3/22/2023, response/answer due 4/12/2023. (Burton, Marc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
3 3 Summons Issued as to Palm Bay International, Inc.. (aao)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
2 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (aao)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Palm Bay International, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16441539, filed by Melani Henkle.(Burton, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)