Tran Bao Chau v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00482 |
Nature of Suit | 540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 23, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 23, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
order
Remand Case to US Agency
Tue 05/23 4:00 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO REMAND CASE TO UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES by Judge Cormac J. Carney. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (twdb) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Remand Case to US Agency
Mon 05/22 3:59 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Remand Case to US Agency United States Citizenship and Immigration Services filed by Defendants Phyllis Coven, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Attorney Evan Richard Franke added to party Phyllis Coven(pty:dft), Attorney Evan Richard Franke added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft))(Franke, Evan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 26, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Wed 04/26 1:09 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA,13 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA,12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is missing. Other error(s) with document(s): Missing from Document #13 filed 4/25/23. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Tue 04/25 1:41 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tran Bao Chau, upon Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 4/24/2023, answer due 6/23/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Unknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached.(Yekrangi, Ashkan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certified Receipts | ||
Friday, April 21, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Fri 04/21 2:47 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tran Bao Chau, upon Defendant Phyllis Coven served on 4/17/2023, answer due 6/16/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Unknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached.(Yekrangi, Ashkan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certified Receipts | ||
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/12 9:50 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Phyllis Coven, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (twdb) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Summons Request
Tue 04/11 3:39 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,9 filed by Plaintiff Tran Bao Chau. (Yekrangi, Ashkan) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Deficiency in Summons
Tue 04/11 11:39 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons, RE: Summons Request8 . The following error(s) was found: The 1st Defendant name on the summons does not match the name on the complaint. The first 1 or 2 names should be a match and then (see attached). The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (twdb) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/22 5:49 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,7 filed by Plaintiff Tran Bao Chau. (Yekrangi, Ashkan) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Deficiency in Summons
Wed 03/22 10:56 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/21 4:55 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 4:54 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/17 11:36 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Tran Bao Chau. (Yekrangi, Ashkan) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 11:32 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tran Bao Chau. (Yekrangi, Ashkan) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 11:31 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tran Bao Chau, identifying USCIS, USCIS SANTA ANA OFFICE DIRECTOR. (Yekrangi, Ashkan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 11:30 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34975279 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Tran Bao Chau. (Attorney Ashkan Yekrangi added to party Tran Bao Chau(pty:pla))(Yekrangi, Ashkan) |