Korttney Elliott v. Norma Graceann Sarkin et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | R Gary Klausner |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02007 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 12, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
Norma Graceann Sarkin
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Korttney Elliott
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago |
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 05/12 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Korttney Elliott. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines
Tue 03/28 9:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court has reviewed the Response filed by plaintiff and plaintiff's counsel to the Court' Order to Show Cause12 . For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's Unruh Act and any other state claim set forth in the complaint. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. (lom) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Response
Mon 03/27 2:26 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Korttney Elliottto Order to Show Cause11 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration | ||
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 03/20 11:47 AM
MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than March 27, 2023. [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION] (es) |
|
10 | 10
adr
Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)
Mon 03/20 10:39 AM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (jre) |
|
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 03/20 10:39 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 9:57 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Norma Graceann Sarkin. (sh) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/20 9:54 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 9:54 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 9:53 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (sh) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/17 12:18 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Korttney Elliott. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 12:17 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 12:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Korttney Elliott. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 12:16 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34975859 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Korttney Elliott(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |