California Central District Court
Judge:R Gary Klausner
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:23-cv-02007
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2023
Terminated:May 12, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:26 AM PDT
Defendant
Norma Graceann Sarkin
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Korttney Elliott
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 12, 2023
14 14 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 05/12 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Korttney Elliott. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
13 13 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines Tue 03/28 9:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court has reviewed the Response filed by plaintiff and plaintiff's counsel to the Court' Order to Show Cause12 . For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's Unruh Act and any other state claim set forth in the complaint. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
12 12 misc Response Mon 03/27 2:26 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Korttney Elliottto Order to Show Cause11 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
Monday, March 20, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 03/20 11:47 AM
MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than March 27, 2023. [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION] (es)
Related: [-]
10 10 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Mon 03/20 10:39 AM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (jre)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 03/20 10:39 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/20 9:57 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Norma Graceann Sarkin. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 03/20 9:54 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 03/20 9:54 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 03/20 9:53 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 03/17 12:18 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Korttney Elliott. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 03/17 12:17 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 03/17 12:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Korttney Elliott. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/17 12:16 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34975859 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Korttney Elliott(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]