New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis J Liman
Case #: 1:23-cv-02291
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2023
Terminated:Apr 24, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 6:13 AM EDT
Defendant
Ibrahim Alimimeh
Represented By
Todd Brian Sherman
Pardalis & Nohavicka LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Doe Corporation
Represented By
Todd Brian Sherman
Pardalis & Nohavicka LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pup Culture LLC
Represented By
Todd Brian Sherman
Pardalis & Nohavicka LLP
contact info
David Michael Kasell
Kasell Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Pupculture Dumbo LLC
Represented By
Todd Brian Sherman
Pardalis & Nohavicka LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pupculture FiDi LLC
Represented By
Todd Brian Sherman
Pardalis & Nohavicka LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pupculture Tribeca LLC
Represented By
Todd Brian Sherman
Pardalis & Nohavicka LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pupculture UWS LLC
Represented By
Todd Brian Sherman
Pardalis & Nohavicka LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ashley Vilella
Represented By
C.K. Lee
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
126 126 order Judgment Wed 04/24 4:43 PM
RULE 68 JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED, that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiffs FANNY ANGELES, YOLANDA ISABEL BARRERA, AMELIA MEDEL, VALERIA PALMA, ANA MARIA VICHIQUE, HAILEY PACHECO, JOEL A DEL VALLE, BREONNA HARDY, BRITTANY PISACANO, and HEIDI ABUNDIZ, in the sum of $23,500.00, in accordance with the terms and conditions of Defendants' Rule 68 Offer of Judgment dated April 12, 2024 and filed as Exhibit A to Docket Number 122. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 4/24/2024) (ate)
Related: [-]
125 125 order Judgment Wed 04/24 4:36 PM
RULE 68 JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED, that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff ASHLEY VILELLA, in the sum of $30,000.00, in accordance with the terms and conditions of Defendants' Rule 68 Offer of Judgment dated April 12, 2024 and filed as Exhibit A to Docket Number 120. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 4/24/2024) (ate)
Related: [-]
124 124 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 04/24 3:29 PM
STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE WITH PREJUDICE F.R.C.P. 41(A)(1)(a)(ii): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, through their respective counsel, that the Fair Labor Standards Act ("FLSA") and the New York Labor Law ("NYLL") wage claims of Opt-in Plaintiff JONATHAN RAMIREZ and Opt-in Plaintiff GIANA MENDY, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, as against Defendants, without costs or attorneys' fees to any party, pursuant Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). For the avoidance of doubt, (i) there has been no settlement for Opt-In Plaintiffs JONATHAN RAMIREZ and GIANA MENDY, and (ii) Plaintiff ASHLEY VILELLA and all other Opt-in Plaintiffs maintain their claims against Defendants in this action. SO ORDERED. Giana Mendy and Jonathan Ramirez terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 4/24/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Transcript Deadlines Wed 04/24 4:46 PM
Terminate Transcript Deadlines (ate)
Related: [-]