Nora Gutierrez v. Dave and Matt Vans, LLC
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Josephine L Staton |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02012 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 08, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2023 4:28 AM PDT |
Defendant
Dave and Matt Vans, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Nora Gutierrez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form
Mon 05/08 10:13 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse. Case number: 23STCV00987. (jp) |
|
21 | 21
order
Remand Case to State Court
Mon 05/08 10:11 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. 23STCV00987 (Doc.15 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court GRANTS Gutierrez's Motion and REMANDS this action to the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. 23STCV00987. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Tue 05/02 4:55 PM
REPLY Reply in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles15 filed by Plaintiff Nora Gutierrez. (Tauler, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Tue 04/25 4:21 PM
OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles15 filed by Defendant Dave and Matt Vans, LLC. (Farkas, Alexander) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 04/18 4:08 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND (Doc.15 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Defendant is ordered to file its Opposition within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order, and any Reply shall be filed within seven (7) days after that. See document for further information. (jp) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 04/18 10:46 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Nora Gutierrez, identifying None. (Tauler, Robert) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Tue 04/18 10:28 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case filed by Plaintiff Nora Gutierrez15 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No notice of interested parties. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Remand Case to State Court
Mon 04/17 2:24 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles filed by Plaintiff Nora Gutierrez. Motion set for hearing on 6/9/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Tauler, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Robert Tauler, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Mon 04/03 8:18 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 6/9/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (vv) |
|
13 | 13
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 04/03 8:09 PM
TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING NOTICE RE DEFENDANT DAVE AND MATT VANS,LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (DKT.9 ): Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the Honorable Judge Josephine L. Staton, United States District Judge, pursuant to the ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT11 filed on March 31, 2023. Defendant Dave and Matt Vans, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint9 currently set for hearing on May 8, 2023 is VACATED. The Court resets the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint9 for June 9, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv) Modified on 4/3/2023 (vv) |
|
12 | 12
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 04/03 1:44 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (vv) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
cs_rasgn
Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89)
Fri 03/31 4:40 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-02012 JLS(JCx). (rn) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Mon 03/27 9:08 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-3 compliance statement missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss Case
Fri 03/24 3:45 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Dave and Matt Vans, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 5/8/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (McMahon, Raymond) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/21 2:25 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 2:24 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 2:23 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 03/17 2:16 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Dave and Matt Vans, LLC, re Disclosure2 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on 3/17/23. (McMahon, Raymond) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 2:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Dave and Matt Vans, LLC. (McMahon, Raymond) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure
Fri 03/17 2:12 PM
DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties/Removal filed by Defendant Dave and Matt Vans, LLC (McMahon, Raymond) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 2:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 23STCV00987 Receipt No: ACACDC-34977014 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Dave and Matt Vans, LLC. (Attorney Raymond J McMahon added to party Dave and Matt Vans, LLC(pty:dft))(McMahon, Raymond) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 03/21 10:30 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Nora Gutierrez in Los Angeles Superior Court on 1/17/2023, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil) |