California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:23-cv-02019
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2023
Terminated:Mar 24, 2023
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 22STLC08035
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 3:08 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Amber M. Ortiz
an individual 4753 Beverly Boulevard
Los Angeles, CA 90004
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Quilt N Things Fiber Arts
Terminated: 03/24/2023
Represented By
Yuriko M. Shikai
Neufeld Marks
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 24, 2023
11 11 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)) Mon 03/27 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Amber M. Ortiz. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
10 10 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 03/22 10:43 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Quilt N Things Fiber Arts, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)5 served on 03/22/2023. (Shikai, Yuriko)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
9 9 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 03/20 4:39 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Quilt N Things Fiber Arts, re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form8 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form7 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,3 , REQUEST to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation,4 served on 03/20/2023. (Shikai, Yuriko)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 03/20 9:07 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 03/20 9:07 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 03/20 9:06 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/20 8:53 AM
AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Quilt 'N" Things Fiber Arts. (Shikai, Yuriko)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
4 4 motion Stay Case and Early Mediation (ADR-21) Fri 03/17 4:13 PM
REQUEST to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by defendant Quilt 'N" Things Fiber Arts. (Shikai, Yuriko)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 03/17 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Quilt 'N" Things Fiber Arts, identifying Amber M. Ortiz Plaintiff, Quilt 'N' Things Fiber Arts Defendant, LANACO LLC Doing business as Quilt 'N' Things Fiber Arts. (Shikai, Yuriko)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 03/17 3:23 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Quilt 'N" Things Fiber Arts. (Shikai, Yuriko)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/17 3:21 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California, case number 22STLC08035 Receipt No: ACACDC-34977862 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Quilt 'N" Things Fiber Arts. (Attorney Yuriko M. Shikai added to party Quilt 'N" Things Fiber Arts(pty:dft))(Shikai, Yuriko)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Complaint,
Att: 3 Notice of Case Assignment,
Att: 4 Important Advisory Information for Building Owners and Tenants (Disability Access Litigation),
Att: 5 Los Angeles Superior Court Third Amended Standing Order dated February 24, 2020,
Att: 6 Los Angeles Superior Court General Order
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 03/20 9:14 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Quilt N Things Fiber Arts, filed by Plaintiff Amber M. Ortiz. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/01/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]