Brittney Sanders et al v. Kia America, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | James V Selna |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00486 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Orange County Superior Court, 30-02023-01306793 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2023 1:55 AM PDT |
Defendant
Hyundai Motor America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kia America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bonny Nasimi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bayron Ortiz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janelle Popken
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brittney Sanders
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terra Snover
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cekia Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Parisa Aghaei
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Monica Alfaro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexander Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adria Antoine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gilmore Augustus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Earl Baker, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcos Barajas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Valerie Barnes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Claudia Barragan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christina Bell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aaliyah Berry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Boult
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katherine Burba
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hope Cain
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Campagna
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dorelyn Carreon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Carter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Krishnaprasad Chandrasekharan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Olivia Chavira
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patti Chorn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ciara Cuevas-Felix
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Antoinette Curry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Delgado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonas Domkus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Draney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Silvia Estrada
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kalaysia Evans
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carolina Franco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Clark Franzman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Azjennae Frazier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erica Galvan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cesar Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Orlando Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sean Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janina Gather
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jasmine Gergis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shenesia Gladney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jorge Gonzales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon Graf
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Murphy Guidice
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Serena Gutierrez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Courtney Hall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexis Hindson-Moraza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bryce Howell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fe Hugo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Blanca Ibarra
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sapphire Jaeckel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Jaramillo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hoa Kaing
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amiee Kim
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kiwon Kim
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jorge Lira
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexandra Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandon Khanh Luu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hilda Maciel-Ruiz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miller Keith Malone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angelica Marin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Marquez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
April Jasmin Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Richard Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lindsey Matthews
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gayretta McClendon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dannay McDaniels
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Medina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Medina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johanna Melchor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mytiana Mitchell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jackelinne Molina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gabriel Montoya
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosa Moreno Aguilar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Asia Morris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Nathaniel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Ochoa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arvin Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Payne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fina Payton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Placenti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Porter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexa Ramirez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Megan Ranger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mildred Reese
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Enrique Reyes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Rivera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Rivera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcos Rivera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Robertson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cristian Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Rosenthal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Blanca Ruiz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Sadowski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joel Salas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lissette Salazar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francisco Sanchez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erica Sanders
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jolene Schrader
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joanne Shack
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Earl Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Sobel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glinnis Sturdivant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Sviatek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victoria Tsang
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Vega
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gilberto Velasco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Vineyard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cheryl Westbrook
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Damon White
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward White
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, November 17, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
![]() MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] Order Regarding Petition for Permission to Seek Interlocutory Appeal19 by Judge James V. Selna: Plaintiffs Brittney Sanders et al. (collectively "Plaintiffs") petition for permission to seek interlocutory appeal. (Pet., Dkt. No. 19.) Defendants Kia America, Inc. and Hyundai Motor America (collectively "Defendants") oppose. (Opp'n, Dkt. No. 23.) Plaintiffs replied. For the following reasons, the Court DENIES the petition. Denying19 PETITION. [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION.] (es) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
![]() REPLY In Support of Petition for Permission PETITION for Leave to Appeal, re: Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,17 , 19 filed by Plaintiffs Parisa Aghaei, Monica Alfaro, Alexander Anderson, Jennifer Anderson, Adria Antoine, Gilmore Augustus, Raymond Earl Baker, Jr, Marcos Barajas, Valerie Barnes, Claudia Barragan, Christina Bell, Aaliyah Berry, Kevin Boult, Katherine Burba, Hope Cain, Michael Campagna, Dorelyn Carreon, Angela Carter, Krishnaprasad Chandrasekharan, Olivia Chavira, Patti Chorn, Ciara Cuevas-Felix, Antoinette Curry, Ashley Delgado, Jonas Domkus, Karen Draney, Silvia Estrada, Kalaysia Evans, Carolina Franco, James Clark Franzman, Azjennae Frazier, Erica Galvan, Cesar Garcia, Orlando Garcia, Sean Garcia, Janina Gather, Jasmine Gergis, Shenesia Gladney, Jorge Gonzales, Sharon Graf, Murphy Guidice, Serena Gutierrez, Courtney Hall, Teresa Hernandez, Alexis Hindson-Moraza, Bryce Howell, Fe Hugo, Blanca Ibarra, Sapphire Jaeckel, Thomas Jaramillo, Hoa Kaing, Amiee Kim, Kiwon Kim, Jorge Lira, Alexandra Lopez, Brandon Khanh Luu, Hilda Maciel-Ruiz, Miller Keith Malone, Angelica Marin, Rachel Marquez, April Jasmin Martinez, William Richard Martinez, Lindsey Matthews, Gayretta McClendon, Dannay McDaniels, Jose Medina, Joseph Medina, Johanna Melchor, Mytiana Mitchell, Jackelinne Molina, Gabriel Montoya, Rosa Moreno Aguilar, Asia Morris, Bonny Nasimi, Juan Nathaniel, Maria Ochoa, Bayron Ortiz, Arvin Patel, Lisa Payne, Fina Payton, Daniel Placenti, Janelle Popken, Jennifer Porter, Alexa Ramirez, Megan Ranger, Mildred Reese, Enrique Reyes, Albert Rivera, Joseph Rivera, Marcos Rivera, Robert Robertson, Cristian Rodriguez, Kimberly Rodriguez, Jason Rosenthal, Blanca Ruiz, Gregory Sadowski, Joel Salas, Lissette Salazar, Francisco Sanchez, Brittney Sanders, Erica Sanders, Jolene Schrader, Joanne Shack, Earl Smith, Terra Snover, Linda Sobel, Glinnis Sturdivant, Eric Sviatek, Victoria Tsang, Joshua Vega, Gilberto Velasco, Brian Vineyard, Cheryl Westbrook, Damon White, Edward White, Cekia Wilson. (Michaels, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
![]() OPPOSITION to PETITION for Leave to Appeal, re: Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,17 , 19 filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Kia America, Inc.. (Attorney Peter J Brennan added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J Brennan added to party Kia America, Inc. (pty:dft))(Brennan, Peter) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
![]() AMENDED ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, re PETITION for Leave to Appeal, re: Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,17 19 The Court ORDERS as follows: 1. Hearing for Petition for Permission is set for Monday, November 20, 2023, at1:30 p.m. 2. Defendant's Opposition is due October 16, 2023. 3. Plaintiff's Reply is due October 27, 2023 Previous order entered on Docket No. 21 was entered in error and should be stricken from the record. (es) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
![]() ORDER19 by Judge James V. Selna: NOTE:CHANGES HAVE BEEN MADE TO THIS DOCUMENT, the Court rules as follows: Plaintiffs' Petition for Permission is GRANTED and ORDERS as follows: 1. Hearing for Petition for Permission is set for Monday, November 20, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. 2. Defendant's Opposition is due October 16, 2023. 3. Plaintiff's Reply is due October 27, 2023. (es) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: PETITION for Leave to Appeal, re: Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,17 , 19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() PETITION for Leave to Appeal, re: Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,17 , filed by Plaintiffs Parisa Aghaei, Monica Alfaro, Alexander Anderson, Jennifer Anderson, Adria Antoine, Gilmore Augustus, Raymond Earl Baker, Jr, Marcos Barajas, Valerie Barnes, Claudia Barragan, Christina Bell, Aaliyah Berry, Kevin Boult, Katherine Burba, Hope Cain, Michael Campagna, Dorelyn Carreon, Angela Carter, Krishnaprasad Chandrasekharan, Olivia Chavira, Patti Chorn, Ciara Cuevas-Felix, Antoinette Curry, Ashley Delgado, Jonas Domkus, Karen Draney, Silvia Estrada, Kalaysia Evans, Carolina Franco, James Clark Franzman, Azjennae Frazier, Erica Galvan, Cesar Garcia, Orlando Garcia, Sean Garcia, Janina Gather, Jasmine Gergis, Shenesia Gladney, Jorge Gonzales, Sharon Graf, Murphy Guidice, Serena Gutierrez, Courtney Hall, Teresa Hernandez, Alexis Hindson-Moraza, Bryce Howell, Fe Hugo, Blanca Ibarra, Sapphire Jaeckel, Thomas Jaramillo, Hoa Kaing, Amiee Kim, Kiwon Kim, Jorge Lira, Alexandra Lopez, Brandon Khanh Luu, Hilda Maciel-Ruiz, Miller Keith Malone, Angelica Marin, Rachel Marquez, April Jasmin Martinez, William Richard Martinez, Lindsey Matthews, Gayretta McClendon, Dannay McDaniels, Jose Medina, Joseph Medina, Johanna Melchor, Mytiana Mitchell, Jackelinne Molina, Gabriel Montoya, Rosa Moreno Aguilar, Asia Morris, Bonny Nasimi, Juan Nathaniel, Maria Ochoa, Bayron Ortiz, Arvin Patel, Lisa Payne, Fina Payton, Daniel Placenti, Janelle Popken, Jennifer Porter, Alexa Ramirez, Megan Ranger, Mildred Reese, Enrique Reyes, Albert Rivera, Joseph Rivera, Marcos Rivera, Robert Robertson, Cristian Rodriguez, Kimberly Rodriguez, Jason Rosenthal, Blanca Ruiz, Gregory Sadowski, Joel Salas, Lissette Salazar, Francisco Sanchez, Brittney Sanders, Erica Sanders, Jolene Schrader, Joanne Shack, Earl Smith, Terra Snover, Linda Sobel, Glinnis Sturdivant, Eric Sviatek, Victoria Tsang, Joshua Vega, Gilberto Velasco, Brian Vineyard, Cheryl Westbrook, Damon White, Edward White, Cekia Wilson. (Michaels, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Notice Notice of Appearance filed by Plaintiffs Parisa Aghaei, Monica Alfaro, Alexander Anderson, Jennifer Anderson, Adria Antoine, Gilmore Augustus, Raymond Earl Baker, Jr, Marcos Barajas, Valerie Barnes, Claudia Barragan, Christina Bell, Aaliyah Berry, Kevin Boult, Katherine Burba, Hope Cain, Michael Campagna, Dorelyn Carreon, Angela Carter, Krishnaprasad Chandrasekharan, Olivia Chavira, Patti Chorn, Ciara Cuevas-Felix, Antoinette Curry, Ashley Delgado, Jonas Domkus, Karen Draney, Silvia Estrada, Kalaysia Evans, Carolina Franco, James Clark Franzman, Azjennae Frazier, Erica Galvan, Cesar Garcia, Orlando Garcia, Sean Garcia, Janina Gather, Jasmine Gergis, Shenesia Gladney, Jorge Gonzales, Sharon Graf, Murphy Guidice, Serena Gutierrez, Courtney Hall, Teresa Hernandez, Alexis Hindson-Moraza, Bryce Howell, Fe Hugo, Blanca Ibarra, Sapphire Jaeckel, Thomas Jaramillo, Hoa Kaing, Amiee Kim, Kiwon Kim, Jorge Lira, Alexandra Lopez, Brandon Khanh Luu, Hilda Maciel-Ruiz, Miller Keith Malone, Angelica Marin, Rachel Marquez, April Jasmin Martinez, William Richard Martinez, Lindsey Matthews, Gayretta McClendon, Dannay McDaniels, Jose Medina, Joseph Medina, Johanna Melchor, Mytiana Mitchell, Jackelinne Molina, Gabriel Montoya, Rosa Moreno Aguilar, Asia Morris, Bonny Nasimi, Juan Nathaniel, Maria Ochoa, Bayron Ortiz, Arvin Patel, Lisa Payne, Fina Payton, Daniel Placenti, Janelle Popken, Jennifer Porter, Alexa Ramirez, Megan Ranger, Mildred Reese, Enrique Reyes, Albert Rivera, Joseph Rivera, Marcos Rivera, Robert Robertson, Cristian Rodriguez, Kimberly Rodriguez, Jason Rosenthal, Blanca Ruiz, Gregory Sadowski, Joel Salas, Lissette Salazar, Francisco Sanchez, Brittney Sanders, Erica Sanders, Jolene Schrader, Joanne Shack, Earl Smith, Terra Snover, Linda Sobel, Glinnis Sturdivant, Eric Sviatek, Victoria Tsang, Joshua Vega, Gilberto Velasco, Brian Vineyard, Cheryl Westbrook, Damon White, Edward White, Cekia Wilson. (Michaels, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] Order Regarding Motion for Remand12 by Judge James V. Selna: The parties appeared for oral argument on June 12, 2023. This Order reflects the Court's final order on the instant motion. For the following reasons, the Court DENIES the motion. Denying12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court. [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION.] (es) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() MINUTES OF Plaintiff's Motion to Remand12 Hearing held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause is called for hearing and counsel make their appearances. The Courts tentative ruling is issued. Counsel make their arguments. The Court's tentative will be the order of the Court. A separate order to follow. Court Reporter: Mary Rickey. (es) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 05/31 10:02 AM
[IN CHAMBERS] SCHEDULING NOTICE: On the Court's own motion, the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to Superior Court12 is continued from June 8, 2023 to June 12, 2023 at 3:00 p.m. before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (eva) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() REPLY support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of California, County of Orange12 filed by Plaintiffs Parisa Aghaei, Monica Alfaro, Alexander Anderson, Jennifer Anderson, Adria Antoine, Gilmore Augustus, Raymond Earl Baker, Jr, Marcos Barajas, Valerie Barnes, Claudia Barragan, Christina Bell, Aaliyah Berry, Kevin Boult, Katherine Burba, Hope Cain, Michael Campagna, Dorelyn Carreon, Angela Carter, Krishnaprasad Chandrasekharan, Olivia Chavira, Patti Chorn, Ciara Cuevas-Felix, Antoinette Curry, Ashley Delgado, Jonas Domkus, Karen Draney, Silvia Estrada, Kalaysia Evans, Carolina Franco, James Clark Franzman, Azjennae Frazier, Erica Galvan, Cesar Garcia, Orlando Garcia, Sean Garcia, Janina Gather, Jasmine Gergis, Shenesia Gladney, Jorge Gonzales, Sharon Graf, Murphy Guidice, Serena Gutierrez, Courtney Hall, Teresa Hernandez, Alexis Hindson-Moraza, Bryce Howell, Fe Hugo, Blanca Ibarra, Sapphire Jaeckel, Thomas Jaramillo, Hoa Kaing, Amiee Kim, Kiwon Kim, Jorge Lira, Alexandra Lopez, Brandon Khanh Luu, Hilda Maciel-Ruiz, Miller Keith Malone, Angelica Marin, Rachel Marquez, April Jasmin Martinez, William Richard Martinez, Lindsey Matthews, Gayretta McClendon, Dannay McDaniels, Jose Medina, Joseph Medina, Johanna Melchor, Mytiana Mitchell, Jackelinne Molina, Gabriel Montoya, Rosa Moreno Aguilar, Asia Morris, Bonny Nasimi, Juan Nathaniel, Maria Ochoa, Bayron Ortiz, Arvin Patel, Lisa Payne, Fina Payton, Daniel Placenti, Janelle Popken, Jennifer Porter, Alexa Ramirez, Megan Ranger, Mildred Reese, Enrique Reyes, Albert Rivera, Joseph Rivera, Marcos Rivera, Robert Robertson, Cristian Rodriguez, Kimberly Rodriguez, Jason Rosenthal, Blanca Ruiz, Gregory Sadowski, Joel Salas, Lissette Salazar, Francisco Sanchez, Brittney Sanders, Erica Sanders, Jolene Schrader, Joanne Shack, Earl Smith, Terra Snover, Linda Sobel, Glinnis Sturdivant, Eric Sviatek, Victoria Tsang, Joshua Vega, Gilberto Velasco, Brian Vineyard, Cheryl Westbrook, Damon White, Edward White, Cekia Wilson.(Michaels, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge James V. Selna, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of California, County of Orange12 . The Court hereby GRANTS Defendants' request and ORDERS as follows: 1. The Motion to Remand hearing, currently set for May 15, 2023 at 1:30 p.m., is continued to align with the next status conference, currently set for June 8, 2023 at 8:00 a.m. 2. Defendants' deadline to oppose the Motion to Remand is extended from April 24, 2023 to May 18, 2023. 3. The Sanders Plaintiffs' deadline to reply is extended from May 1, 2023 to May 25, 2023. (es) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of California, County of Orange filed by Plaintiffs Parisa Aghaei, Monica Alfaro, Alexander Anderson, Jennifer Anderson, Adria Antoine, Gilmore Augustus, Raymond Earl Baker, Jr, Marcos Barajas, Valerie Barnes, Claudia Barragan, Christina Bell, Aaliyah Berry, Kevin Boult, Katherine Burba, Hope Cain, Michael Campagna, Dorelyn Carreon, Angela Carter, Krishnaprasad Chandrasekharan, Olivia Chavira, Patti Chorn, Ciara Cuevas-Felix, Antoinette Curry, Ashley Delgado, Jonas Domkus, Karen Draney, Silvia Estrada, Kalaysia Evans, Carolina Franco, James Clark Franzman, Azjennae Frazier, Erica Galvan, Cesar Garcia, Orlando Garcia, Sean Garcia, Janina Gather, Jasmine Gergis, Shenesia Gladney, Jorge Gonzales, Sharon Graf, Murphy Guidice, Serena Gutierrez, Courtney Hall, Teresa Hernandez, Alexis Hindson-Moraza, Bryce Howell, Fe Hugo, Blanca Ibarra, Sapphire Jaeckel, Thomas Jaramillo, Hoa Kaing, Amiee Kim, Kiwon Kim, Jorge Lira, Alexandra Lopez, Brandon Khanh Luu, Hilda Maciel-Ruiz, Miller Keith Malone, Angelica Marin, Rachel Marquez, April Jasmin Martinez, William Richard Martinez, Lindsey Matthews, Gayretta McClendon, Dannay McDaniels, Jose Medina, Joseph Medina, Johanna Melchor, Mytiana Mitchell, Jackelinne Molina, Gabriel Montoya, Rosa Moreno Aguilar, Asia Morris, Bonny Nasimi, Juan Nathaniel, Maria Ochoa, Bayron Ortiz, Arvin Patel, Lisa Payne, Fina Payton, Daniel Placenti, Janelle Popken, Jennifer Porter, Alexa Ramirez, Megan Ranger, Mildred Reese, Enrique Reyes, Albert Rivera, Joseph Rivera, Marcos Rivera, Robert Robertson, Cristian Rodriguez, Kimberly Rodriguez, Jason Rosenthal, Blanca Ruiz, Gregory Sadowski, Joel Salas, Lissette Salazar, Francisco Sanchez, Brittney Sanders, Erica Sanders, Jolene Schrader, Joanne Shack, Earl Smith, Terra Snover, Linda Sobel, Glinnis Sturdivant, Eric Sviatek, Victoria Tsang, Joshua Vega, Gilberto Velasco, Brian Vineyard, Cheryl Westbrook, Damon White, Edward White, Cekia Wilson. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Michaels, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:22-ml-03052 JVS(KESx). Case transferred from Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth to Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:23-cv-00486 JVS(KESx). Signed by Judge James V. Selna (rn) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Peter J. Brennan. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Kia America, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice of Related Case(s)5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 served on March 17, 2023. (Spelman, Kate) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Kia America, Inc.. Related Case(s): In re: Kia Hyundai Vehicle Theft Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation, Case No. 8:22-ML-3052 (Spelman, Kate) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Hyundai Motor America's Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Kia America, Inc., identifying Kia Corporation and Hyundai Motor Company. (Spelman, Kate) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Kia America, Inc.'s Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Kia America, Inc., identifying Kia Corporation and Hyundai Motor Company. (Spelman, Kate) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Kia America, Inc.. (Spelman, Kate) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2023 01306793-CU-PL-CXC Receipt No: ACACDC-34978840 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Kia America, Inc.. (Attorney Kate Spelman added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft), Attorney Kate Spelman added to party Kia America, Inc. (pty:dft))(Spelman, Kate) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/20 5:00 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Hyundai Motor America, Kia America, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs. Filed in State Court on 2/6/2023 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal1 (car) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 03/20 5:40 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs, upon Defendant Hyundai Motor America served on 2/17/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Trudy Desbiens Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 2/24/2023 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal1 (car) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 03/20 5:48 PM
CONORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs, upon Defendant Kia America, Inc. served on 2/17/2023, answer due 3/10/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System Sarai Marin, Intake Specialist Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 2/24/2023 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal1 (car) |