California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:23-cv-02023
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2023
Terminated:Jul 05, 2023
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 23STCV03409
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2023 7:41 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By
Aracely Abarca
Jones Day
contact info
Liat Yamini
Jones Day
contact info
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Natasha Chesler
Represented By
Natasha R Chesler
Chesler Law P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mary Leon
Represented By
Wendy B Pfau
Potter Cohen Samulon And Padilla
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
22 22 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 07/05 9:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS IN CHAMBERS ORDER MOVING CASE TO INACTIVE CALENDAR PENDING SETTLEMENT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court, having received the Notice of Settlement21 , filed July 4, 2023, vacates all previously set dates. The Court moves the matter to the inactive calendar pending finalization of settlement. The parties shall proceed with the settlement as outlined in the notice. Should the settlement not be finalized within the designated time, the parties shall notify the Court, in writing, and request that the matter be restored to the active calendar. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 04, 2023
21 21 notice Settlement Tue 07/04 12:43 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by PLAINTIFF Mary Leon. (Pfau, Wendy)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
20 20 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Fri 06/16 2:05 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Natasha Chesler has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Fri 06/16 1:36 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than July 12, 2023. (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
18 18 adr Request for ADR Procedure No. 2 - (ADR-1) Thu 06/15 2:31 PM
REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 2 filed. Parties request to appear before a neutral selected from the court's Mediation Panel for mediation. Filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.(Abarca, Aracely)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order Thu 06/15 12:42 PM
ORDER CONTINUING DEADLINE FOR MEDIATION15 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The deadline for the Parties to participate in mediation is continued to July 12, 2023. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
16 16 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Wed 06/14 1:54 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Natasha Chesler may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.(Abarca, Aracely)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
15 15 stip Continue Mon 06/12 2:36 PM
STIPULATION to Continue DEADLINE FOR MEDIATION from JUNE 23, 2023 to JULY 12, 2023 filed by PLAINTIFF Mary Leon.(Pfau, Wendy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration OF WENDY B. PFAU IN SUPPORT OF JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR MEDIATION,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
14 14 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 05/31 10:58 AM
IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: Stipulation to Continue13 - The Stipulation is DENIED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
13 13 stip Continue Mon 05/22 4:49 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Pretrial Deadlines and Trial Date from Pretrial Conference on 8/7/23 and Jury Trial on 8/15/23 to Pretrial Conference to 11/6/23 and Jury Trial to 11/14/23 filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc..(Abarca, Aracely)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
11 11 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Tue 04/18 10:54 AM
CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
12 12 minutes Status Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/18 1:28 PM
MINUTES OF NEW CASE STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Status conference held. The Court sets the following dates: Pretrial Conference August 7, 2023 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial August 15, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
10 10 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 03/20 2:53 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 4/17/2023 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 03/20 2:46 PM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 03/17 4:29 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 03/17 4:29 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 03/17 4:28 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Declaration Fri 03/17 4:19 PM
DECLARATION of Shannon Baisden re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Abarca, Aracely)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/17 3:50 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc. identifying United Parcel Service, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Abarca, Aracely)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 03/17 3:46 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc., identifying United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Abarca, Aracely)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 03/17 3:40 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Abarca, Aracely)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/17 3:38 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 23STCV03409 Receipt No: ACACDC-34978424 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attorney Aracely Abarca added to party United Parcel Service, Inc.(pty:dft))(Abarca, Aracely)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 43 pgs Exhibit Documents filed in the State Court Action,
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Case Management Conference,
Att: 3 Exhibit Defendants Answer,
Att: 4 Exhibit Notice to Adverse Party and State Court of Removal of Civil Action
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 03/17 4:22 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, United Parcel Service, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Mary Leon.[FILED IN STATE COURT 02/15/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Fri 03/17 4:24 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.[FILED IN STATE COURT 03/16/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 EXHIBIT C TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh)
Related: [-]