Jorge Eliecer Gongora Hinestroza v. United States of America
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02026 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1346 Tort Claim |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 06, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:30 AM PDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jorge Eliecer Gongora Hinestroza
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, September 08, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer)
Mon 09/25 2:57 PM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Southern District of Texas, 4:23-cv-03354 filed 9/8/2023. (rolm) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
order
For Order
Thu 09/07 5:39 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER14 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Motion to Transfer is GRANTED. The Court therefore does not reach the part of the Motion seeking dismissal of the Complaint. The Clerk is ORDERED to transfer the above-captioned action to the Southern District of Texas. Case transferred electronically. (iv) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
minutes
Motion Hearing For Order
Tue 08/15 10:32 AM
MINUTES OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS14 held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (iv) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 08/01 3:00 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On the Court's own motion, the Motion For Order for to Transfer, or in the alternative, to Dismiss14 is continued to 8/14/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 07/24 4:37 PM
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for TO TRANSFER, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES 14 filed by Defendant United States of America. (Quist, Sarah) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 07/10 1:07 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for TO TRANSFER, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES 14 filed by Plaintiff Jorge Eliecer Gongora Hinestroza.(Davis, Elliott) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Jorge Eliecer Gongora Hinestroza, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Evelyn Wiese, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 07/10 12:39 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eva Marie Mannoia Weiler counsel for Plaintiff Jorge Eliecer Gongora Hinestroza. Adding Eva M. Weiler as counsel of record for Jorge Eliecer Gongora Hinestroza for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Jorge Eliecer Gongora Hinestroza. (Attorney Eva Marie Mannoia Weiler added to party Jorge Eliecer Gongora Hinestroza(pty:pla))(Weiler, Eva Marie) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines
Tue 06/27 3:43 PM
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUING HEARING REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS16 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiffs Opposition Due: July 10, 2023.Defendant's Reply Due: July 24, 2023. Motion Hearing: August 7, 2023, 10:00am. (iv) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 06/26 6:37 PM
ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Elliott Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jorge Eliecer Gongora Hinestroza, designating Diana Chang as local counsel15 . (iv) |
|
16 | 16
4
pgs
stip
Order
Mon 06/26 11:35 AM
STIPULATION for Order TO SET A BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUE THE HEARING REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS filed by Defendant United States of America.(Quist, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Thu 06/22 2:28 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elliott M. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jorge Eliecer Gongora Hinestroza (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35538572) filed by Plaintiff Jorge Eliecer Gongora Hinestroza. (Chang, Diana) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
30+
pgs
motion
Order
Tue 06/20 4:51 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for TO TRANSFER, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Defendant United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 7/24/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Quist, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Larry Adams, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Larry Adams; Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Nora Salinas, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Nora Salinas; Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration of Nora Salinas; Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 6 Declaration of Nora Salinas; Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 7 Declaration of Nora Salinas; Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 8 Declaration of Dontrice Eaton, | ||
Att: 9 Declaration of Camilo Cuellar, | ||
Att: 10 Declaration of Camilo Cuellar; Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 11 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 05/18 3:47 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States of America answer now due 6/19/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants United States of America.(Attorney Sarah M S Quist added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Quist, Sarah) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 05/11 5:01 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jorge Eliecer Gongora Hinestroza, upon Defendant United States of America served on 3/24/2023, answer due 5/23/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk for the Central District of California and Office of Attorney General Merrick B. Garland. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Chang, Diana) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jorge Eliecer Gongora Hinestroza, (Wiese, Evelyn) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Mon 03/20 3:54 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 3:50 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant United States of America c/o Attorney General Merrick B Garland. (car) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 3:47 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant United States of America c/o U.S. Attorney's Office. (car) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/20 3:15 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 3:14 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 3:14 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/17 4:10 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Jorge Eliecer Gongora Hinestroza. (Chang, Diana) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/17 4:09 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Jorge Eliecer Gongora Hinestroza. (Chang, Diana) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 4:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jorge Eliecer Gongora Hinestroza. (Chang, Diana) |
|
1 | 1
26
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 3:52 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34978602 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Jorge Eliecer Gongora Hinestroza. (Attorney Diana A Chang added to party Jorge Eliecer Gongora Hinestroza(pty:pla))(Chang, Diana) |