California Central District Court
Judge:Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:23-cv-02029
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2023
Terminated:Oct 02, 2023
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 23STCV03143
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:34 AM PDT
Defendant
Belden Inc.
Represented By
Todd B Scherwin
Fisher And Phillips LLP
contact info
Christopher David Chaplin
Fisher And Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
William Bennett
Represented By
Sadhana Ghimire Bhetuwal
Jml Law Aplc
contact info
Jared Wesley Beilke
Jml Law, Aplc
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, October 02, 2023
21 21 order Dismissing Case Tue 10/03 9:07 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court, having considered the parties' Joint Stipulation for dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure20 , hereby dismisses with prejudice the action in its entirety. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The Court vacates all dates and deadlines. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
20 20 stip Dismiss Case Fri 09/29 2:35 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by DEFENDANT Belden Inc..(Chaplin, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Monday, April 24, 2023
17 17 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 04/24 7:10 AM
Notice of Clerical Error by the Clerk: The docket entry at Dkt. No.16 has been corrected to reflect the post-settlement status conference hearing as set within the order. The post-settlement status conference is set for hearing on December 15, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6C. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
19 19 9 pgs order Order Mon 04/24 7:18 AM
ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Mon 04/24 7:15 AM
PRETRIAL AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/21 4:23 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr: PLEASE READ THIS ORDER (AND ATTACHMENT) CAREFULLY: The post-settlement status conference is set for December 22, 2023 at 8:30 AM. The pretrial conference is set for January 12, 2024 at 10:00 AM. The jury trial is set for January 22, 2024 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DATES AND DEADLINES. (jgr)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Scheduling Conference - optional html form Fri 04/21 4:20 PM
MINUTES OF Mandatory Scheduling Conference held before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court and the parties discussed the contents of the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report. The Court orders the parties to exchange initial disclosures within 14 days, no later than May 5, 2023. The Court will issue a separate Case Management Order. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (jgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
14 14 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 04/19 3:50 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Plaintiff's and Defendant's counsel's requests to appear remotely at the Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for April 21, 2023 are GRANTED. Lead counsel for both parties are permitted to attend the Conference remotely. Instructions for remote appearance can be found on Judge Blumenfeld's webpage. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
13 13 misc Declaration Tue 04/11 4:07 PM
DECLARATION of Christopher Chaplin for April 21, 2023 Mandatory Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant Belden Inc.. (Chaplin, Christopher)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Declaration Tue 04/11 3:57 PM
DECLARATION of Sadhana Ghimire filed by Plaintiff William Bennett. (Ghimire Bhetuwal, Sadhana)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Report Tue 04/11 3:55 PM
Joint (26(f) REPORT filed by Plaintiff William Bennett. (Ghimire Bhetuwal, Sadhana)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
10 10 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 03/20 3:23 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on April 21, 2023 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by April 11, 2023. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 03/20 3:22 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 03/20 1:14 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 03/20 1:13 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 03/20 1:13 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
5 5 notice Related Case(s) Fri 03/17 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Belden Inc.. Related Case(s): None (Chaplin, Christopher)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/17 3:59 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Belden Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Chaplin, Christopher)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 03/17 3:57 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Belden Inc., identifying Plaintiff William Bennett; Defendant Belden Inc.. (Chaplin, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 03/17 3:55 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Belden Inc.. (Chaplin, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/17 3:55 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 23STCV03143 Receipt No: ACACDC-34978855 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Belden Inc.. (Attorney Christopher David Chaplin added to party Belden Inc.(pty:dft))(Chaplin, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Christopher Chaplin in Support of Removal,
Att: 2 Declaration of Brian E. Anderson in Support of Removal,
Att: 3 15 pgs State Court Complaint
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 03/20 1:18 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Belden Inc., Does. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff William Bennett. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/14/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 03/20 1:20 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Belden Inc. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/16/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 )(lh)
Related: [-]