Nevada District Court
Judge:Miranda M Du
Referred: Craig S Denney
Case #: 3:23-cv-00112
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2023
Terminated:Nov 08, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Carson City Animal Services
Defendant
Carson City District Attorney
Defendant
Nevada Humane Society
Plaintiff
Shannon Ranae Millard
3450 Otha St
Carson City, NV 89706


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
6 6 order Judgment Wed 11/08 11:18 AM
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to ECF No.5 Order. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 11/8/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Report and Recommendation Order Dismissing Case Wed 11/08 11:16 AM
ORDER - Judge Denney's Report and Recommendation (ECF No.4 ) is accepted and adopted in full . This action is dismissed without prejudice. Millard's IFP application (ECF No.1 ) is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/8/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
4 4 motion Report and Recommendation Fri 10/20 3:10 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Recommend dismissing action without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 11/3/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 10/20/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order Thu 08/03 2:15 PM
ORDER - The Clerk shall SEND Plaintiff a copy of the instructions and application to proceed IFP for a non-prisoner. (Mailed 8/3/2023.) Plaintiff has 30 days from the date of this Order (9/2/2023) to either file a completed IFP application or pay the full $402 filing fee. If Plaintiff fails to timely file a completed IFP application or pay the filing fee, the court will recommend dismissal of this action without prejudice. Finally, the court notes that it appears Plaintiff's complaint may be dismissed on screening for lack of jurisdiction because Plaintiff asserts state tort claims and both Plaintiff and Defendants all seem to reside in the State of Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 8/3/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Mon 03/20 9:18 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
1 1 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 03/20 9:12 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court without prepaying fees or costs by Plaintiff Shannon Ranae Millard.(DLS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 03/17 3:25 PM
Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (CJS)
Related: [-]