Susana Rojas v. Champion Home Builders, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Shashi H Kewalramani |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00472 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 24, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Riverside Superior Court, CVRI2300773 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2023 2:00 AM PDT |
Defendant
Champion Home Builders, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Susana Rojas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form
Mon 03/27 10:59 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of Riverside. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of Riverside. (aco) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
minutes
Status Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 03/27 10:58 AM
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Percy Anderson. The Court having waived Local Rule 6-1 barring oral motions, Plaintiff's counsel moved to remand the action to the Riverside County Superior Court based on Defendant's failure to adequately allege a basis for the Court's subject matter jurisdiction in the Notice of Removal. Based on Defendant's failure to satisfy its burden to adequately allege a basis for the Court's subject matter jurisdiction, the Court granted Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Accordingly, this action is hereby remanded to Riverside County Superior Court, Case Number CVRI2300773, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (See document for further details). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Suzanne McKennon. (aco) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
trial
Jury Demand
Thu 03/23 12:38 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Susana Rojas.. (Sarris, Nicholas) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/23 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Susana Rojas, (Sarris, Nicholas) |
|
9 | 9
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 03/23 8:18 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Percy Anderson Status Conference is set for 3/24/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/24 8:40 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/21 4:51 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 4:50 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 4:50 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Percy Anderson. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:23-cv-0482 PA (SHKx). (jtil) |
|
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 03/21 3:27 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Susana Rojas in Riverside Superior Court on 2/14/2023, attached to Matias Decl as Exhibit A. (jtil) Modified on 3/21/2023 (jtil) |
||
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/17 5:35 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Champion Home Builders, Inc. identifying Skyline Champion Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Ibechem, Chigoziri) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 5:32 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Ibechem, Chigoziri) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Related Case(s)
Fri 03/17 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Champion Home Builders, Inc.. (Ibechem, Chigoziri) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 5:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Champion Home Builders, Inc.. (Ibechem, Chigoziri) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 5:23 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number CVRI2300773 Receipt No: ACACDC-34980122 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Champion Home Builders, Inc.. (Attorney Chigoziri Jasmine Ibechem added to party Champion Home Builders, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ibechem, Chigoziri) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Ryan Boehm ISO, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Patricia Matias ISO with Exhibits A-D | ||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Tue 03/21 3:32 PM
NON CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Champion Home Builders, Inc., attached to Matias Decl as Exhibit B. (jtil) |