California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Jacqueline Chooljian
Case #: 2:23-cv-02037
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2023
Terminated:Sep 13, 2024
Case in other court:Los Angeles County Superior Court, 23STCV03390
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 9:55 AM PDT
Defendant
Apple, Inc.
Represented By
Kathleen Cahill Slaught
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Amanda L. Genovese
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Ryan Robert Tikker
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By
Kathleen Cahill Slaught
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mehdi Eskandarloo
Represented By
Jonathan Aaron Stieglitz
Law Offices Of Jonathan Stieglitz
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Terminated: 08/27/2023
Represented By
Kathleen Cahill Slaught
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Amanda L. Genovese
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Ryan Robert Tikker
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 31 minutes ago
Friday, September 13, 2024
50 50 order Dismissing Case Sat 09/14 2:05 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE49 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The above-entitled action is DISMISSED in its entirety with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1). Each party shall bear their own costs and fees. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
49 49 stip Dismiss Case Thu 09/12 9:49 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Mehdi Eskandarloo.(Stieglitz, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order