Raymond Johnson v. The Trade Desk, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Pedro V Castillo |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02038 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Los Angeles County Superior Court, 23STCV03344 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 9:09 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
United Healthcare Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Johnson
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
The Trade Desk, Inc.
Terminated: 06/12/2023
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Terminated: 06/12/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 04/25 2:20 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. At the request of counsel and with the Court's approval, the Show Cause Hearing is continued to 6/3/2024 at 11:30 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 02/28 11:24 AM
COURT ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/29/2024 at 11:30 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (rs) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Settlement
Thu 02/22 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendant United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Slaught, Kathleen) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 02/21 11:49 AM
MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo: On February 21, 2024, the Court held an in-person settlement conference. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant were present, as well as Plaintiff and Defendant's representative. The Court conferred with the parties individually and collectively, off the record. A settlement was reached. The essential terms of the settlement agreement were placed on the record, agreed to by all parties, and the record was ordered sealed. Counsel are directed to file a notice of settlement with the District Judge, and once the settlement is finalized, to file a request of dismissal of the case. Attorney for Plaintiff: Jonathan Aaron Stieglitz. Attorney for Defendant: Ryan Robert Tikker. Courtroom Deputy: Marlene Ramirez. Time in Court: 1:45 min. (THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY). Court Recorder: CS 2/21/24. (mr) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 02/01 12:26 PM
ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo for settlement proceedings. The Settlement Conference is placed on calendar for Wednesday, February 21, 2024, at 9:30 a.m., Courtroom 540, Fifth Floor, 255 E. Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. The Conference will be IN PERSON. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
order
Protective Order
Fri 12/01 11:39 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo re STIPULATION for Protective Order34 . (see document for details) (hr) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Protective Order
Thu 11/30 4:34 PM
REQUEST for Protective Order for (Stipulated Protective Order) filed by Defendant United Healthcare Insurance Company.(Slaught, Kathleen) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Thu 08/10 5:18 PM
ORDER RE COURT TRIAL by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Last Day to Add Parties/Amend Pleadings 12/18/2023. Non-expert Discovery Cut-off 11/20/2023. Trial Date (Est. 1 to 2 Days) 4/2/2024 at 8:30 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) |
|
32 | 32
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12)
Thu 08/10 5:14 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge assigned to the case for Settlement Conference. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 2/23/2024. (iv) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 08/08 1:35 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On its own motion, the Court VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2023 at 11:00 a.m. No appearances shall be made. The Court will review the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and issue pretrial and trial dates by separate order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Errata
Mon 07/31 5:06 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant United Healthcare Insurance Company. correcting Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan29 (Slaught, Kathleen) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 07/31 10:51 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 1-2 days, filed by Defendant United Healthcare Insurance Company.. (Slaught, Kathleen) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Tue 07/11 11:06 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (rs) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/22 3:29 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition23 filed by Defendant United Healthcare Insurance Company.(Attorney Kathleen Cahill Slaught added to party United Healthcare Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Slaught, Kathleen) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
minutes
Telephone Conference ~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 06/15 4:22 PM
MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The parties agreed that the Defendant would respond to the First Amended Complaint by June 26, 2023. The hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint21 set for June 26, 2023 is VACATED. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (iv) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 06/13 3:59 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On its own motion, the Court VACATES the hearing on the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint21 filed by Defendants The Trade Desk, Inc. and United Healthcare Services, Inc. ("Defendants"). The Court ORDERS counsel for Plaintiff and Defendants to appear for a Telephonic Status Conference on Thursday, 6/15/2023, at 2:30 p.m. The call-in information is (877) 411-9748, Access Code 6448503. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Non-Opposition to Motion
Mon 06/12 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint 21 filed by Defendants The Trade Desk, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Slaught, Kathleen) |
|
23 | 23
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Mon 06/12 1:04 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant United Healthcare Services, Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff Raymond Johnson(Stieglitz, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
misc
For Judicial Notice
Fri 05/12 3:02 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint 21 filed by Defendants The Trade Desk, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc..(Slaught, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
21 | 21
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Fri 05/12 2:59 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendants The Trade Desk, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/26/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Slaught, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Wed 04/05 3:26 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT DUE TO ONGOING CONFERRAL19 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Having read the stipulation of the parties (Docket No. 19), and for good cause shown, the Court hereby GRANTS the parties' request. 1. The deadline by which Defendants have to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended 28 days from April 14, 2023 to May 12, 2023. (bm) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Tue 04/04 5:50 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to May 12, 2023 filed by Defendants The Trade Desk, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc..(Slaught, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation and Request to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint | ||
18 | 18
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/04 4:42 PM
ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Amanda Genovese to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Trade Desk, Inc. and United HealthCare Services, Inc., designating Ryan Tikker as local counsel16 . (iv) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Tue 04/04 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amanda L. Genovese to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants The Trade Desk, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 3/20/2023, Receipt No. 34989529)16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Order has not been flattened and is causing a corruption with the filing. (lt) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Fri 03/31 11:56 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amanda L. Genovese to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants The Trade Desk, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 3/20/2023, Receipt No. 34989529) filed by Defendants The Trade Desk, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Tikker, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 2:46 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) -14 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The document is stricken. Filer has also not complied with Local Rule 5-4.4 which requires that a word-processing version of the proposed Order be emailed to chambers. (smom) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 6:10 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amanda L. Genovese to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants The Trade Desk, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/20/2023, Receipt No. 34989529)13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Other error(s) with document(s): Applicant failed to list state bars where they are admitted. Only listed appellate and district courts. See Instructions for Applicants (1)(G-64). (lt) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Wed 03/22 4:24 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amanda L. Genovese to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants The Trade Desk, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/20/2023, Receipt No. 34989529) filed by Defendants The Trade Desk, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Tikker, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 11:19 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) -10 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The document is stricken. (smom) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 03/21 3:42 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United Healthcare Services, Inc. answer now due 4/14/2023; The Trade Desk, Inc. answer now due 4/14/2023, filed by Defendants United Healthcare Services, Inc.; The Trade Desk, Inc..(Slaught, Kathleen) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 12:34 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amanda L. Genovese to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants The Trade Desk, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34989529)9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed, as to local counsel. (sbou) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Mon 03/20 5:10 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amanda L. Genovese to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants The Trade Desk, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34989529) filed by Defendants The Trade Desk, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Slaught, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 1:14 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Amanda L. Genovese. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/20 1:09 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 1:09 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 1:08 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (sh) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 5:25 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants The Trade Desk, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., identifying Plaintiff Raymond Johnson, Advanced Weight Loss Surgical Association, Minimally Invasive Surgical Association, Defendant The Trade Desk, Inc., Defendant United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Slaught, Kathleen) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 5:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants The Trade Desk, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Slaught, Kathleen) |
|
2 | 2
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 03/17 5:21 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants The Trade Desk, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 served on March 17, 2023. (Slaught, Kathleen) |
|
1 | 1
5
pgs
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 5:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 23STCV03344 Receipt No: ACACDC-34980088 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants United Healthcare Services, Inc., The Trade Desk, Inc.. (Attorney Kathleen Cahill Slaught added to party The Trade Desk, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kathleen Cahill Slaught added to party United Healthcare Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Slaught, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 9 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Ian Eisner, Esq., | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Ian Eisner, Esq. | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/20 1:03 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, The Trade Desk, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc.Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Raymond Johnson.[FILED IN STATE COURT 02/15/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh) |