James Chad Horton v. Kilolo Kijakazi
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Alka Sagar |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00473 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 22, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 05, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() ORDER AWARDING EAJA FEES by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Re: Stipulation for Award of EAJA Fees13 . (see document for details) (hr) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Fri 06/16 7:28 AM
NOTICE - A copy of the MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR AWARD OF EAJA FEES (Docket No.14 was mailed to plaintiff via USPS to: James Chad Horton, 28179 Lindell Road, Lake Elsinore, CA 92532. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (afe) TEXT ONLY ENTRY |
|
14 | 14
![]() MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR AWARD OF EAJA FEES by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar, re: Stipulation for Award of EAJA Fees13 . The Court will afford Plaintiff James Chad Horton (14) days from the date of this minute order to file any objections to the Stipulation and Proposed Order for payment. (hr) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees in the amount of $1,558.22. filed by Plaintiff James Chad Horton.(Benavides, Francesco) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() JUDGMENT11 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar granting Stipulation to Remand Case to US Agency10 . The Court having approved the parties' stipulation to remand this case pursuant to Sentence 4 of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for further proceedings consistent with that stipulation and for entry of judgment for Plaintiff, judgment is hereby entered for Plaintiff. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lom) |
|
11 | 11
![]() ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned action is remanded to the Commissioner of Social Security for further proceedings consistent with the terms of the Stipulation for Remand. (lom) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() STIPULATION to Remand Case to US Agency Social Security Administration filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Tarn, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/06 9:15 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV23-473 AS on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff James Chad Horton. (Benavides, Francesco) |
|
6 | 6
![]() ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting4 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Non-Prisoner Case). (twdb) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff James Chad Horton. (Benavides, Francesco) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff James Chad Horton, (Benavides, Francesco) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff James Chad Horton. (Benavides, Francesco) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff James Chad Horton. (Attorney Francesco P Benavides added to party James Chad Horton(pty:pla))(Benavides, Francesco) |