1661, Inc. v. Green Goat, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John W Holcomb |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00490 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 19, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 2:42 AM PDT |
Defendant
Eric Gates
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Green Goat, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mario Tovar
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
1661, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 19, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
![]() STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff 1661, Inc..(Barry, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, August 22, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
![]() ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge John W. Holcomb. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for Settlement Conference. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 8/9/2024. (cla) |
|
22 | 22
![]() CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. Discovery cut-off 7/12/2024; Last date to conduct settlement conference is 8/9/2024; Disposition Motions cut-off 9/20/2024; Motions in Limine cut-off 10/25/2024; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/1/2024 at 1:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 11/18/2024 at 9:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Tue 08/08 3:54 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on August 11, 2023, is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff 1661, Inc... (Barry, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE18 by Judge John W. Holcomb. Having reviewed the Parties' Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference and finding good cause exists, the Court hereby GRANTS the stipulation and ORDERS that the Scheduling Conference and related dates are CONTINUED as follows: The last day to Meet and Confer re Joint Rule 26(f) Report is July 21, 2023. The last day to file the Joint Rule 26(f) Report is July 28, 2023. The scheduling conference is continued to August 11, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) |
|
18 | 18
![]() STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from July 7, 2023 to August 11, 2023 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only16 filed by Plaintiff 1661, Inc..(Barry, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),15 . The following error(s) was/were found: [15-1] The certificate of interested parties should be filed as a stand alone document under civil events, notice of interested parties In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl) |
|
16 | 16
![]() ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants Eric Gates, Green Goat, LLC, Mario Tovar.(Attorney Clifford L White added to party Eric Gates(pty:dft), Attorney Clifford L White added to party Green Goat, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Clifford L White added to party Mario Tovar(pty:dft))(White, Clifford) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Adam Alexander Herrera counsel for Plaintiff 1661, Inc.. Adding Adam A. Herrera as counsel of record for Plaintiff 1661, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff 1661, Inc.. (Herrera, Adam) |
|
13 | 13
![]() AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff 1661, Inc.. Amendment to Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 (Barry, Jennifer) |
|
12 | 12
![]() AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff 1661, Inc.. Amendment to Corporate Disclosure Statement4 (Barry, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Eric Gates, Green Goat, LLC, Mario Tovar. (lh) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff 1661, Inc.. (Barry, Jennifer) |
|
5 | 5
![]() REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by 1661, Inc.. (Barry, Jennifer) |
|
4 | 4
![]() CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff 1661, Inc. (Barry, Jennifer) |
|
3 | 3
![]() CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff 1661, Inc., (Barry, Jennifer) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff 1661, Inc.. (Barry, Jennifer) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34980175 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff 1661, Inc.. (Attorney Jennifer L Barry added to party 1661, Inc.(pty:pla))(Barry, Jennifer) |