Smith LC v. Kinon Sandlin
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Wesley L Hsu |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00491 |
Nature of Suit | 896 Other Statutes - Arbitration |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 16, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:18 AM PDT |
Defendant
Simon Hoyle
|
|
Defendant
Kinnon Sandlin
|
|
Plaintiff
Smith LC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 06/16 5:26 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Smith LC. Dismissal is without. (Smith, Steven) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
cs_rasgn
Chief District Judge Transferring Case
Mon 05/22 11:08 AM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-051) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Wesley L. Hsu, this case is transferred from Judge James V. Selna to the calendar of Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:23-cv-00491-WLH-JDEx. (sn) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/28 9:30 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Kinnon Sandlin. (es) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/28 9:29 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Simon Hoyle. (es) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Summons Request
Thu 04/27 10:50 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Smith LC. (Smith, Steven) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Summons Request
Thu 04/27 10:49 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Smith LC. (Smith, Steven) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Deficiency in Summons
Thu 04/27 9:15 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request10 . The following error(s) was found: Incomplete Case Number [See Dkt. 3] Notice of Assignment: The case number on all documents filed with the Court should read as follows: 8:23cv00491 JVS (JDEx). The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (es) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Summons Request
Wed 04/26 10:46 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Smith LC.(Smith, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/29 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Smith LC, identifying Kinnon Sandlin and Simon Hoyle. (Muir, Kipp) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Appearance
Wed 03/29 1:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kipp Scott Muir on behalf of Plaintiff Smith LC (Attorney Kipp Scott Muir added to party Smith LC(pty:pla))(Muir, Kipp) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/24 2:08 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (eva) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Wed 03/22 11:02 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/21 4:57 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
4 | 4
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 4:57 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 4:56 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 5:51 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Smith LC. (Smith, Steven) |
|
1 | 1
14
pgs
cmp
Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 5:50 PM
PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION Receipt No: ACACDC-34980343 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Smith LC. (Attorney Steven C Smith added to party Smith LC(pty:bkmov))(Smith, Steven) |