California Central District Court
Judge:Wesley L Hsu
Referred: John D Early
Case #: 8:23-cv-00491
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2023
Terminated:Jun 16, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Simon Hoyle
Defendant
Kinnon Sandlin
Plaintiff
Smith LC
Represented By
Kipp Scott Muir
Smith Lc
contact info
Steven C Smith
Smith Lc
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, June 16, 2023
17 17 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 06/16 5:26 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Smith LC. Dismissal is without. (Smith, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
16 16 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Mon 05/22 11:08 AM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-051) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Wesley L. Hsu, this case is transferred from Judge James V. Selna to the calendar of Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:23-cv-00491-WLH-JDEx. (sn)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
15 15 service Summons Issued Fri 04/28 9:30 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Kinnon Sandlin. (es)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued Fri 04/28 9:29 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Simon Hoyle. (es)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
13 13 notice Summons Request Thu 04/27 10:50 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Smith LC. (Smith, Steven)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Summons Request Thu 04/27 10:49 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Smith LC. (Smith, Steven)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Deficiency in Summons Thu 04/27 9:15 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request10 . The following error(s) was found: Incomplete Case Number [See Dkt. 3] Notice of Assignment: The case number on all documents filed with the Court should read as follows: 8:23cv00491 JVS (JDEx). The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (es)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
10 10 notice Summons Request Wed 04/26 10:46 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Smith LC.(Smith, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
9 9 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 03/29 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Smith LC, identifying Kinnon Sandlin and Simon Hoyle. (Muir, Kipp)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Appearance Wed 03/29 1:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kipp Scott Muir on behalf of Plaintiff Smith LC (Attorney Kipp Scott Muir added to party Smith LC(pty:pla))(Muir, Kipp)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 03/24 2:08 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (eva)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
6 6 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Wed 03/22 11:02 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 03/21 4:57 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
4 4 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 03/21 4:57 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 03/21 4:56 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 03/17 5:51 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Smith LC. (Smith, Steven)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/17 5:50 PM
PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION Receipt No: ACACDC-34980343 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Smith LC. (Attorney Steven C Smith added to party Smith LC(pty:bkmov))(Smith, Steven)
Related: [-]