Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Thomas L Ludington
Referred: Patricia T Morris
Case #: 1:23-cv-10625
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2023
Terminated:Mar 28, 2025
Case in other court:Midland County Circuit Court, 23-01827-CD-B
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 10:24 AM EDT
Defendant
DDP Specialty Electronic Materials US, Inc.
Represented By
Daniel L. Villaire, Jr.
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PLLC
contact info
Lauren Harrington
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Koscielski
Represented By
Kevin J. Kelly
The Mastromarco Firm
contact info
Rikki Mechelle Mays-Reak
Mastromarco Firm
contact info
Victor J. Mastromarco, Jr.
The Mastromarco Firm
contact info
Rikki Mechelle Mays-Reak, I
Mastromarco Firm
contact info

GPO Mar 28 2025
OPINION and ORDER Granting Defendant's 20 Motion for Summary Judgment and Dismissing Plaintiff's [1-2] Complaint. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
36 36 appeal Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit* Mon 04/28 9:02 AM
Certificate of Service re35 Notice of Appeal. (MCho)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
35 35 appeal Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit Fri 04/25 5:42 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by All Plaintiffs re31 Memorandum Opinion & Order, Terminate Motions. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10213369 - Fee: $ 605 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Kelly, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
34 34 misc Costs Taxed Fri 04/04 4:02 PM
Costs Taxed in amount of $ $3,703.68 against Plaintiff. (NAhm)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Bill of Costs Fri 04/04 11:42 AM
BILL OF COSTS by DDP Specialty Electronic Materials US, Inc. (Villaire, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
32 32 order Judgment* Fri 03/28 2:23 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
Related: [-]
31 31 18 pgs order Memorandum Opinion & Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 03/28 2:21 PM
OPINION and ORDER Granting Defendant's20 Motion for Summary Judgment and Dismissing Plaintiff's [1-2] Complaint. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
30 30 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/14 4:17 PM
ORDER ADJOURNING SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2025 AT 4:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Jury Trial set for 5/28/2025 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Related [+] (KWin)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
29 29 order Scheduling Order Wed 10/09 4:02 PM
ORDER Adjourning Scheduling Order. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2025 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Jury Trial set for 3/25/2025 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Related [+] (KWin)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
Friday, August 09, 2024
28 28 order Scheduling Order Fri 08/09 3:50 PM
ORDER ADJOURNING SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/2024 at 4:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Jury Trial set for 12/17/2024 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Related [+] (KWin)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
Friday, July 26, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 07/26 3:15 PM
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Counsel's26 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
26 26 motion Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 07/25 2:37 PM
MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Rikki Mays-Reak by All Plaintiffs. (Mays-Reak, Rikki)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
25 25 order Scheduling Order Wed 05/15 9:57 AM
ORDER Adjourning SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2024 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Jury Trial set for 9/10/2024 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Related [+] (KWin)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
Friday, April 26, 2024
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Fri 04/26 9:29 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing on 5/8/2024 is Cancelled re20 MOTION for Summary Judgment. A Written Decision will be Issued Without Oral Argument Based on the Filed Documents. (KWin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
24 24 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 04/02 6:55 PM
REPLY to Response re20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DDP Specialty Electronic Materials US, Inc.. (Villaire, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 24 - Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit 25 - Plaintiff's pay records,
Att: 4 Exhibit 26 - Raini Lucus' Pay Records
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
23 23 respm Response to Motion Tue 03/19 7:27 PM
RESPONSE to20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Robert Koscielski. (Kelly, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1. Koscielski Deposition, vol. I,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2. 02/16/21 Note,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3. 02/19/21 Note,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4. Obeid Slip,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5. 03/04/21 Note,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6. 03/09/21 Slip,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7. 03/23/21 State,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8. Visit Notes,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9. 07/13/21 Note,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10. 08/06/21 Note,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11. 08/05/21 Slip,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12. Accommodation Review,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13. Koscielski Deposition, vol. II,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14. Harrigan Deposition,
Att: 16 Exhibit 15. Huschke Deposition,
Att: 17 Exhibit 16. March Emails,
Att: 18 Exhibit 17. Meyers Deposition,
Att: 19 Exhibit 18. Lucas Deposition,
Att: 20 Exhibit 19. Skiver Emails,
Att: 21 Exhibit 20. 12/07/22 Emails,
Att: 22 Exhibit 21. 02/09/23 Email
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
22 22 minutes ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Stipulation and Order Tue 03/12 3:54 PM
ORDER Granting Stipulation to Adjourn Response Deadline and Adjourning Response Deadline re Defendant's20 Motion for Summary Judgment. ( Response due by 3/19/2024. ) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
21 21 notice Hearing on Motion* Fri 03/01 5:03 PM
NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on20 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2024 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
20 20 motion Summary Judgment Tue 02/20 7:40 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by DDP Specialty Electronic Materials US, Inc.. (Villaire, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Robert Koscielski Deposition Transcript,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Justin Huschke Deposition Transcript,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Special Resins Operator Job Description,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - 08.06.2021 Clinic Visit History,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Raini Lucus Deposition Transcript,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiffs Time Cards,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - Raini Lucus Time Cards,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Patrick Harrigan Deposition Transcript,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - Restriction Clarification Form,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 - 07.06.2022 Clinic Visit History,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 - Kristen Skiver Deposition Transcript,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12 - Interactive Accommodation Process Form,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13 - 11.04.22 Doctors Note,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14 - 11.02.22 Clinic Visit History,
Att: 16 Exhibit 15 - 12.15.22 Email to Plaintiff re updated restrictions, DRK0000238,
Att: 17 Exhibit 16 - 10.31.22 Email to Plaintiff re termination, DRK0000238-239,
Att: 18 Exhibit 17 - Mike Meyers Deposition Transcript,
Att: 19 Exhibit 18 - 08.05.2021 Doctors Note,
Att: 20 Exhibit 19 - Cation-TA and Anion-TA Job Postings and Application,
Att: 21 Exhibit 20 - Engineer Job Posting,
Att: 22 Exhibit 21 - Plaintiffs Application and Anion TA job description,
Att: 23 Exhibit 22 - Jacob Buck Time Cards,
Att: 24 Exhibit 23 - Steven Kula Time Cards
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
19 19 trial Witness List Wed 01/31 2:48 PM
First Amended WITNESS LIST by All Plaintiffs (Mastromarco, Victor)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
18 18 misc Attorney Appearance Mon 01/22 10:49 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Victor Joseph Mastromarco, III appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mastromarco, Victor)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Mon 01/22 4:47 PM
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington: Settlement Conference held on 1/22/2024. Disposition: No settlement reached. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (KWin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
17 17 notice Appear* Wed 01/10 9:03 AM
REMINDER NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: In-Person Settlement Conference set for 1/22/2024 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
16 16 order Scheduling Order Thu 11/02 11:38 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER Adjourning SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/2/2024; Settlement Conference set for 1/22/2024 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 2/20/2024; Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/5/2024 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Jury Trial set for 6/25/2024 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Related [+] (KWin)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
Monday, October 30, 2023
15 15 notice Appear* Mon 10/30 1:39 PM
REMINDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: In-Person Settlement Conference set for 11/8/2023 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
14 14 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/27 1:45 PM
Case Management and SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/31/2023; Settlement Conference set for 11/8/2023 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/28/2023; Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2024 at 4:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Jury Trial set for 4/30/2024 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Related [+] (KWin)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
Thursday, April 13, 2023
13 13 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Thu 04/13 11:45 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by DDP Specialty Electronic Materials US, Inc. (Villaire, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/07 9:26 AM
ORDER to Submit Material for Case Management Order. ( Short Statements Submitted to Utilities; Proposed Orders by 4/26/2023. ) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/06 5:20 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by DDP Specialty Electronic Materials US, Inc.. (Villaire, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
10 10 3 pgs order Order Mon 04/03 4:38 PM
ORDER Denying Stipulation to Adjourn Answer Deadline. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Attorney Appearance Mon 04/03 11:15 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Victor J. Mastromarco, Jr appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mastromarco, Victor)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Attorney Appearance Mon 04/03 11:12 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Rikki Mechelle Mays-Reak, I appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mays-Reak, Rikki)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Attorney Appearance Mon 04/03 11:07 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kevin J. Kelly appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kelly, Kevin)
Related: [-]
notice Error Mon 04/03 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Error directed to: Victor J. Mastromarco, Jr re4 Attorney Appearance. Wrong or incomplete PDF image was uploaded. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (TTho)
Related: [-]
notice Error Mon 04/03 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Error directed to: Kevin J. Kelly re5 Attorney Appearance. Wrong or incomplete PDF image was uploaded. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (TTho)
Related: [-]
notice Error Mon 04/03 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Error directed to: Rikki Mechelle Mays-Reak, I re6 Attorney Appearance. Wrong or incomplete PDF image was uploaded. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (TTho)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 01, 2023
6 6 misc Attorney Appearance Sat 04/01 1:18 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Rikki Mechelle Mays-Reak, I appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mays-Reak, Rikki)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Attorney Appearance Sat 04/01 1:17 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kevin J. Kelly appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kelly, Kevin)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Attorney Appearance Sat 04/01 1:13 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Victor J. Mastromarco, Jr appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mastromarco, Victor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
3 3 misc Attorney Appearance Wed 03/29 4:56 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lauren Harrington appearing on behalf of DDP Specialty Electronic Materials US, Inc. (Harrington, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
2 2 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/24 9:47 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Adjourning Defendant DDP Specialty Electronic Materials' Responsive Pleading Deadline re1 (Notice of Removal) Complaint. ( Response due by 4/6/2023. ) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Fri 03/17 8:20 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DPer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DDP Specialty Electronic Materials US, Inc. from Midland County Circuit Court, case number 23-1824 CD-B. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9276100 - Fee: $ 402 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Villaire, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs Complaint & Demand for Trial by Jury,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal