New Jersey District Court
Judge:Christine P O'Hearn
Referred: Sharon A King
Case #: 1:23-cv-01509
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 1:05 PM EDT
Defendant
JOHN DOE COMPANY 1-10
Defendant
SERVIS ONE, INC.
Represented By
ALINA LEVI
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
DIANA M ENG
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
ANDREA MARIE ROBERTS
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
VALBONA JONUZI
Represented By
KENNETH FRANCIS PSOTA
contact info

GPO Mar 20 2025
OPINION. Signed by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 3/20/2025. (mag)

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
88 88 order Order Tue 05/06 10:22 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having received the May 1, 2025 letter [ECF No. 87] filed by Thomas P. Cialino, Esquire, counsel for Defendant Servis One, Inc., advising of the parties' June 12, 2025 confirmed mediation; it is hereby ORDERED that, if necessary, a telephone status conference is scheduled for June 25, 2025 at 12:00 p.m. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-856-210-8988, Conference ID: 796 881 998#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 5/6/25. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
87 87 misc Letter Thu 05/01 12:27 PM
Letter from Counsel for Defendant Servis One, Inc. d/b/a BSI Financial Services re Mediation Date Set re86 Order Appointing Mediator,, Add and Terminate Parties,. (CIALINO, THOMAS)
Related: [-]