Arizona District Court
Judge:Douglas L Rayes
Case #: 2:14-cv-02235
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2014
Terminated:Jan 19, 2016
Last checked: Friday May 08, 2015 2:22 PM MST
Defendant
Microchip Technology Incorporated
Represented By
Eric Michael Fraser
Osborn Maledon PA
contact info
Sharad H Desai
Osborn Maledon PA
contact info
Defendant
Microchip Technology Ireland
Represented By
Eric Michael Fraser
Osborn Maledon PA
contact info
Sharad H Desai
Osborn Maledon PA
contact info
Plaintiff
VTech Communications Limited
Represented By
Karl Michael Tilleman
Steptoe & Johnson Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Melissa Elizabeth Posner
Steptoe & Johnson Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Jason M Porter
Steptoe & Johnson Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
James R Nuttall
Steptoe & Johnson Llp - Chicago, Il
contact info
Erin Elizabeth Bradham
Steptoe & Johnson Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Microchip Technology Hong Kong Limited
Terminated: 05/01/2015
Represented By
Eric Michael Fraser
Osborn Maledon PA
contact info
Sharad H Desai
Osborn Maledon PA
contact info
Defendant
Microchip Technology Ireland Limited
Terminated: 05/05/2015
Represented By
Eric Michael Fraser
Osborn Maledon PA
contact info
Sharad H Desai
Osborn Maledon PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM MST
Tuesday, January 19, 2016
52 52 order Order Dismissing Case Tue 01/19 2:33 PM
ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the parties Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice, (Doc.51 ), and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and this action are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/19/2016. (REK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2016
51 51 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 01/13 3:37 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by VTech Communications Limited.(Porter, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order