Dyneka Collier et al v. 1940 Carmen LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02039 |
Nature of Suit | 896 Other Statutes - Arbitration |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 6:35 AM PDT |
Defendant
Alexander G. Stein
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Esther Stein
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
1940 Carmen LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Dyneka Collier
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Fri 06/02 4:54 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,13 filed by 1940 Carmen LLC, Alexander G. Stein, Esther Stein. CCA # 23-55283 Accordingly, this appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute. This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as and for the mandate of this court. (mat) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Receipt
Mon 04/10 11:15 AM
Receipt of acknowledgment letter from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, 111 N. Hill St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Case No. 21STCV28101. (bm) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
USCA Notification of Case Number
Thu 03/30 11:18 AM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 23-55283 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,13 as to Plaintiff Dyneka Collier. (mat) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
appeal
Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
Mon 03/27 7:42 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendants 1940 Carmen LLC, Alexander G. Stein, Esther Stein. Appeal of Status Conference - optional html form,,, Terminated Case,,, Set/Clear Flags,,11 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35031439.) (Weiser, Frank) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form
Mon 03/27 10:29 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. (aco) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
minutes
Status Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 03/27 10:22 AM
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Percy Anderson. For all the foregoing reasons, Defendants have failed to meet their burden to demonstrate that federal question jurisdiction exists over this action. The Court having waived Local Rule 6-1 barring oral motions, Plaintiff's counsel moved to remand this action to the Los Angeles County Superior Court based on Defendants' failure to adequately allege a basis for the Court's subject matter jurisdiction. Accordingly, the Court remands this action to the Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case No. 21STCV28101, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (See document for further details). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston. (aco) |
|
10 | 10
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 03/22 10:20 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Percy Anderson. Status Conference by ZOOM is set for 3/22/2023 at 03:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Tue 03/21 10:51 AM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] by Judge Percy Anderson. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for May 1, 2023, at 10:30 a.m. This action has been assigned to the calendar of United States District Judge Percy Anderson. (See document for further details). (aco) |
|
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 10:41 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/20 2:24 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 2:24 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 2:23 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh) |
|
Sunday, March 19, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Sun 03/19 6:16 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants 1940 Carmen LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, Alexander G. Stein, Esther Stein, identifying Plaintiff Dyneka Collier, Defendant 1940 Carmen LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, Defendant Alexander G. Stein, Defendant Esther Stein. (Weiser, Frank) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Sun 03/19 6:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants 1940 Carmen LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, Alexander G. Stein, Esther Stein. (Weiser, Frank) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Errata
Sun 03/19 6:11 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants 1940 Carmen LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, Alexander G. Stein, Esther Stein. correcting Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 Errata to Notice of Removal of State Case to Federal Court (Weiser, Frank) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 6:18 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV28101 Receipt No: ACACDC-34980426 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Esther Stein, Alexander G. Stein, 1940 Carmen LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. (Attorney Frank A Weiser added to party 1940 Carmen LLC, a California Limited Liability Company(pty:dft), Attorney Frank A Weiser added to party Alexander G. Stein(pty:dft), Attorney Frank A Weiser added to party Esther Stein(pty:dft))(Weiser, Frank) |
|
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/20 2:28 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants 1940 Carmen LLC, Does, Alexander G. Stein, Esther Stein. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Dyneka Collier. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 7/30/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh) |