Ashkan Farazmand v. Travis Vanderzanden et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Otis D Wright, II |
Referred: | Alicia G Rosenberg |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02042 |
Nature of Suit | 160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 8:19 AM PDT |
Defendant
Roelof Botha
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Travis Vanderzanden
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sam Stoutner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Sacks
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Racquel Russell
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Precious Owodunni
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James Mutrie
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scott McNeill
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Yibo Ling
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ray Kubis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Komin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nathaniel Kan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scott Gieselman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Daniel Friedland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Philip Deutch
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chris Carter
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bird Global, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashkan Farazmand
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago |
Monday, January 08, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Micol Small counsel for Defendants Bird Global, Inc., Roelof Botha, Chris Carter, Philip Deutch, Daniel Friedland, Scott Gieselman, Nathaniel Kan, Robert Komin, Ray Kubis, Yibo Ling, Scott McNeill, James Mutrie, Precious Owodunni, Racquel Russell, David Sacks, Sam Stoutner, Travis Vanderzanden. Changing firm name to Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth LLP. Filed by Defendants Bird Global, Inc., Roelof Botha, Chris Carter, Philip Deutch, Daniel Friedland, Scott Gieselman, Nathaniel Kan, Robert Komin, Ray Kubis, Yibo Ling, Scott McNeill, James Mutrie, Precious Owodunni, Racquel Russell, David Sacks, Sam Stoutner, Travis Vanderzanden. (Small, Micol) |
|
21 | 21
![]() NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Tucker Scott Atkins counsel for Defendants Bird Global, Inc., Roelof Botha, Chris Carter, Philip Deutch, Daniel Friedland, Scott Gieselman, Nathaniel Kan, Robert Komin, Ray Kubis, Yibo Ling, Scott McNeill, James Mutrie, Precious Owodunni, Racquel Russell, David Sacks, Sam Stoutner, Travis Vanderzanden. Changing firm name to Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth LLP. Filed by Defendants Bird Global, Inc., Roelof Botha, Chris Carter, Philip Deutch, Daniel Friedland, Scott Gieselman, Nathaniel Kan, Robert Komin, Ray Kubis, Yibo Ling, Scott McNeill, James Mutrie, Precious Owodunni, Racquel Russell, David Sacks, Sam Stoutner, Travis Vanderzanden. (Atkins, Tucker) |
|
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Lisa M Northrup counsel for Defendants Bird Global, Inc., Roelof Botha, Chris Carter, Philip Deutch, Daniel Friedland, Scott Gieselman, Nathaniel Kan, Robert Komin, Ray Kubis, Yibo Ling, Scott McNeill, James Mutrie, Precious Owodunni, Racquel Russell, David Sacks, Sam Stoutner, Travis Vanderzanden. Changing firm name to Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth LLP. Filed by Defendants Bird Global, Inc., Roelof Botha, Chris Carter, Philip Deutch, Daniel Friedland, Scott Gieselman, Nathaniel Kan, Robert Komin, Ray Kubis, Yibo Ling, Scott McNeill, James Mutrie, Precious Owodunni, Racquel Russell, David Sacks, Sam Stoutner, Travis Vanderzanden. (Northrup, Lisa) |
|
19 | 19
![]() NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Jason de Bretteville counsel for Defendants Bird Global, Inc., Roelof Botha, Chris Carter, Philip Deutch, Daniel Friedland, Scott Gieselman, Nathaniel Kan, Robert Komin, Yibo Ling, Scott McNeill, James Mutrie, Precious Owodunni, Racquel Russell, David Sacks, Sam Stoutner, Travis Vanderzanden. Changing firm name to Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth LLP. Filed by Defendants Bird Global, Inc., Roelof Botha, Chris Carter, Philip Deutch, Daniel Friedland, Scott Gieselman, Nathaniel Kan, Robert Komin, Yibo Ling, Scott McNeill, James Mutrie, Precious Owodunni, Racquel Russell, David Sacks, Sam Stoutner, Travis Vanderzanden. (de Bretteville, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Notice of Suggestion of Bankruptcy filed by Defendant Bird Global, Inc..(de Bretteville, Jason) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY CASE16 AND STAYING CASE. This action is STAYED pending resolution of the consolidated securities class action, entitled Arias v. Bird Global, Inc. et al., Case No. 2:22-cv-08406-ODW (AGRx). The parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than ten (10) days after any resolution of the consolidated securities class action. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL DETAILS ENUMERATED HEREIN). (lc) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending resolution of the consolidated securities class action, entitled Arias v. Bird Global, Inc. et al., case no. 2:22-cv-08406-ODW-AGR filed by Defendants Bird Global, Inc., Roelof Botha, Chris Carter, Philip Deutch, Daniel Friedland, Scott Gieselman, Nathaniel Kan, Robert Komin, Ray Kubis, Yibo Ling, Scott McNeill, James Mutrie, Precious Owodunni, Racquel Russell, David Sacks, Sam Stoutner, Travis Vanderzanden. (de Bretteville, Jason) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court received and reviewed the parties' Stipulation to stay this case13 . Aside from pointing out that this case and Arias v. Bird Global, Inc., No. 2:22-cv-08406-ODW (AGRx) arise from the same basic set of facts, the parties provide no additional justification for why this case should be stayed. Separate and apart from whether the stay itself is appropriate, the parties also proposeseveral additional orders, some of which are highly complex and tedious, without attempting to demonstrate good cause why the Court should issue those additional orders. Stipulation DENIED. Defendants' answer or other response to theComplaint is due no later than June 13, 2023. (lc) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 23-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:22-cv-08406 ODW(AGRx). Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-02042 ODW(AGRx). Signed by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (rn) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending resolution of consolidated Securities Class Action, Case No. 2:22-cv-08406-ODW-AGRx filed by Defendants Bird Global, Inc., Roelof Botha, Chris Carter, Philip Deutch, Daniel Friedland, Scott Gieselman, Nathaniel Kan, Robert Komin, Ray Kubis, Yibo Ling, Scott McNeill, James Mutrie, Precious Owodunni, Racquel Russell, David Sacks, Sam Stoutner, Travis Vanderzanden.(de Bretteville, Jason) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Bird Global, Inc., Roelof Botha, Chris Carter, Philip Deutch, Daniel Friedland, Scott Gieselman, Nathaniel Kan, Robert Komin, Ray Kubis, Yibo Ling, Scott McNeill, James Mutrie, Precious Owodunni, Racquel Russell, David Sacks, Sam Stoutner, Travis Vanderzanden. Related Case(s): 2:22-cv-08406-ODW-AGRx (de Bretteville, Jason) |
|
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying Bird Global, Inc., Travis Vanderzanden, Yibo Ling, Roelof Botha, Daniel Friedland, Nathaniel Kan, Robert Komin, James Mutrie, Racquel Russell, David Sacks, Scott McNeill, Chris Carter, Scott Gieselman, Sam Stoutner, Philip Deutch, Ray Kubis, and Precious Owodunni. (de Bretteville, Jason) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lisa M Northrup counsel for Defendants Bird Global, Inc., Roelof Botha, Chris Carter, Philip Deutch, Daniel Friedland, Scott Gieselman, Nathaniel Kan, Robert Komin, Ray Kubis, Yibo Ling, Scott McNeill, James Mutrie, Precious Owodunni, Racquel Russell, David Sacks, Sam Stoutner, Travis Vanderzanden. Adding Lisa M. Northrup as counsel of record for Defendants Bird Global, Inc., Travis Vanderzanden, Yibo Ling, Roelof Botha, Daniel Friedland, Nathaniel Kan, Robert Komin, James Mutrie, Racquel Russell, David Sacks, Scott McNeill, Chris Carter, Scott Gieselman, Sam Stoutner, Philip Deutch, Ray Kubis, and Precious Owodunni for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Bird Global, Inc., Travis Vanderzanden, Yibo Ling, Roelof Botha, Daniel Friedland, Nathaniel Kan, Robert Komin, James Mutrie, Racquel Russell, David Sacks, Scott McNeill, Chris Carter, Scott Gieselman, Sam Stoutner, Philip Deutch, Ray Kubis, and Precious Owodunni. (Attorney Lisa M Northrup added to party Bird Global, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa M Northrup added to party Roelof Botha(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa M Northrup added to party Chris Carter(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa M Northrup added to party Philip Deutch(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa M Northrup added to party Daniel Friedland(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa M Northrup added to party Scott Gieselman(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa M Northrup added to party Nathaniel Kan(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa M Northrup added to party Robert Komin(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa M Northrup added to party Ray Kubis(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa M Northrup added to party Yibo Ling(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa M Northrup added to party Scott McNeill(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa M Northrup added to party James Mutrie(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa M Northrup added to party Precious Owodunni(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa M Northrup added to party Racquel Russell(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa M Northrup added to party David Sacks(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa M Northrup added to party Sam Stoutner(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa M Northrup added to party Travis Vanderzanden(pty:dft))(Northrup, Lisa) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jason de Bretteville counsel for Defendants Bird Global, Inc., Roelof Botha, Chris Carter, Philip Deutch, Daniel Friedland, Scott Gieselman, Nathaniel Kan, Robert Komin, Ray Kubis, Yibo Ling, Scott McNeill, James Mutrie, Precious Owodunni, Racquel Russell, David Sacks, Sam Stoutner, Travis Vanderzanden. Adding Jason de Bretteville as counsel of record for Defendants Bird Global, Inc., Travis Vanderzanden, Yibo Ling, Roelof Botha, Daniel Friedland, Nathaniel Kan, Robert Komin, James Mutrie, Racquel Russell, David Sacks, Scott McNeill, Chris Carter, Scott Gieselman, Sam Stoutner, Philip Deutch, Ray Kubis, and Precious Owodunni for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Bird Global, Inc., Travis Vanderzanden, Yibo Ling, Roelof Botha, Daniel Friedland, Nathaniel Kan, Robert Komin, James Mutrie, Racquel Russell, David Sacks, Scott McNeill, Chris Carter, Scott Gieselman, Sam Stoutner, Philip Deutch, Ray Kubis, and Precious Owodunni. (Attorney Jason de Bretteville added to party Bird Global, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jason de Bretteville added to party Roelof Botha(pty:dft), Attorney Jason de Bretteville added to party Chris Carter(pty:dft), Attorney Jason de Bretteville added to party Philip Deutch(pty:dft), Attorney Jason de Bretteville added to party Daniel Friedland(pty:dft), Attorney Jason de Bretteville added to party Scott Gieselman(pty:dft), Attorney Jason de Bretteville added to party Nathaniel Kan(pty:dft), Attorney Jason de Bretteville added to party Robert Komin(pty:dft), Attorney Jason de Bretteville added to party Ray Kubis(pty:dft), Attorney Jason de Bretteville added to party Yibo Ling(pty:dft), Attorney Jason de Bretteville added to party Scott McNeill(pty:dft), Attorney Jason de Bretteville added to party James Mutrie(pty:dft), Attorney Jason de Bretteville added to party Precious Owodunni(pty:dft), Attorney Jason de Bretteville added to party Racquel Russell(pty:dft), Attorney Jason de Bretteville added to party David Sacks(pty:dft), Attorney Jason de Bretteville added to party Sam Stoutner(pty:dft), Attorney Jason de Bretteville added to party Travis Vanderzanden(pty:dft))(de Bretteville, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Bird Global, Inc., Roelof Botha, Chris Carter, Philip Deutch, Daniel Friedland, Scott Gieselman, Nathaniel Kan, Robert Komin, Ray Kubis, Yibo Ling, Scott McNeill, James Mutrie, Precious Owodunni, Racquel Russell, David Sacks, Sam Stoutner and Travis Vanderzanden. (jtil) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Ashkan Farazmand, (Moest, Robert) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Ashkan Farazmand. (Moest, Robert) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ashkan Farazmand. (Moest, Robert) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34980724 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Ashkan Farazmand. (Attorney Robert C Moest added to party Ashkan Farazmand(pty:pla))(Moest, Robert) |