California Central District Court
Case #: 2:23-cr-00077
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2023
Terminated:Dec 15, 2023
Last checked: Monday Dec 25, 2023 1:08 AM PST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jeremy Keller Beecher
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Nisha Chandran
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
George Cristea (1)
Terminated: 12/15/2023
Represented By
Lisa Shinar LaBarre
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
George G. Mgdesyan
Mgdesyan Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 2:10 PM PDT
Friday, February 03, 2023
2 2 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant George Cristea (mhe) [2:23-mj-00522-DUTY]
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALED EX PARTE APPLICATION to Seal Case Filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant George Cristea. (mhe) [2:23-mj-00522-DUTY]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero: granting3 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Seal Case as to George Cristea (1) (mhe) [2:23-mj-00522-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
5 5 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant George Cristea; defendants Year of Birth: 1988; date of arrest: 2/2/2023 (mhe) [2:23-mj-00522-DUTY]
Related: [-]
6 6 SEALED MINUTES OF INITIAL APPEARANCE ON LOCAL COMPLAINT held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson as to Defendant George Cristea. Defendant arraigned and advised of the charges. Defendant states true name as charged. Attorney: Lisa Shinar LaBarre for George Cristea, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Detention Hearing set for 2/9/2023 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ROMANIAN) INTERPRETER Required as to Defendant George Cristea Court Smart: CS 2/6/23. (mhe) [2:23-mj-00522-DUTY]
Related: [-]
7 7 ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant George Cristea. (mhe) [2:23-mj-00522-DUTY]
Related: [-]
8 8 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant George Cristea. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (mhe) [2:23-mj-00522-DUTY]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant George Cristea (mhe) [2:23-mj-00522-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
10 10 MINUTES OF Detention Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson as to Defendant George Cristea, The Court Orders the defendant permanently detained. The Complaint is to remain SEALED. The Court docket is to be UNSEALED. Rule 5 was previously given to the Govt Court Smart: 2/9/23. (mhe) [2:23-mj-00522-DUTY]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR for Preliminary Hearing and Arraignment on Indictment/Information. Defendant George Cristea is directed to appear for Preliminary Hearing on 2/21/23 at 11:30 am and for Post Indictment Arraignment on 2/27/23 at 11:30 am before the Duty Magistrate Judge. (mhe) [2:23-mj-00522-DUTY]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER OF DETENTION by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson as to Defendant George Cristea, (mhe) [2:23-mj-00522-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
13 13 INDICTMENT Filed as to George Cristea (1) count(s) 1-4, 5, 6, 7. Offense occurred in LA. (ja)
Related: [-]
14 14 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Nisha Chandran as to Defendant George Cristea; defendants Year of Birth: 1988 (ja)
Related: [-]