Ya Zhang v. Alejandro Mayorkas et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jesus G Bernal |
Referred: | Kenly Kiya Kato |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00453 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 05, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 2:18 AM PDT |
Defendant
Merrick Garland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Radel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ya Zhang
A 212 961-875 11667 Autumn Save Avenue
Jarupa Valley, CA 91752 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, July 05, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 07/05 10:37 AM
ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY THE CASE PENDING ADJUDICATION OF APPLICATION9 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the instant action shall be stayed until July 23, 2024. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
stip
Stay Case
Fri 06/30 11:42 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Adjudication Of Application filed by Defendants Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Radel.(Attorney Evan R. Franke added to party Merrick Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Evan R. Franke added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Evan R. Franke added to party David Radel(pty:dft))(Franke, Evan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/16 3:23 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 3:22 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 3:20 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ya Zhang. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/16 3:19 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendants Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Radel. (ghap) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/16 3:18 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendant David Radel. (ghap) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/16 3:17 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendant Merrick Garland. (ghap) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/16 3:16 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas. (ghap) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 03/16 3:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Defendants Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Radel.Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kato.(Filing fee $ 402:PAID), filed by plaintiff Ya Zhang. (ghap) |
|
Att: 1 CV-71 |