Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc. v. Garden Gate New Orleans
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Daniel E Knowles, III |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-02319 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Oct 09, 2014 |
Terminated: | Nov 06, 2014 |
Last checked: Friday May 08, 2015 4:37 PM CDT |
Defendant
The Garden Gate New Orleans, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Garden Gate New Orleans
|
|
Plaintiff
Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, November 06, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER granting5 the Motion to Dismiss Case, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/5/14. (dno) | |
Wednesday, November 05, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Case without prejudice by Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc..(Murov, Ellis) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, October 13, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Garden Gate New Orleans served on 10/10/2014, answer due 10/31/2014. (Murov, Ellis) | |
Friday, October 10, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Garden Gate New Orleans. (plh) | |
Thursday, October 09, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (mmv) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Garden Gate New Orleans (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-4619271) filed by Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc.Attorney Ellis B. Murov added to party Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc.(pty:pla).(Murov, Ellis) Modified on 10/10/2014 (plh). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Summons |