American Trust Investment Services, Inc. v. Sean D. Caston
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John F Walter |
Referred: | Alexander F Mackinnon |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02044 |
Nature of Suit | 896 Other Statutes - Arbitration |
Cause | 09:0010 Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 25, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 9:12 AM PDT |
Petitioner
American Trust Investment Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Sean D. Caston
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 25, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 10/25 2:38 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) DISMISSAL OF ACTION FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge John F. Walter. As of the date of this Order, there has been no response to the Court's Order to Show Cause. Accordingly, this action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 09/27 7:50 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing, no later than October 3, 2023, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (iv) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 04/07 1:15 PM
Text Entry Order STRIKING MOTION to Vacate16 . Hearing date is not in compliance with the Court's Standing Order.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Fri 04/07 10:25 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Motion to Vacate16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Proposed orders not lodged with a main document shall be electronically lodged as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Vacate
Thu 04/06 10:53 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate filed by Petitioner American Trust Investment Services, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/10/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Castle, James) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Vacate, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Andrew S. May in Support of Motion to Vacate, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit K to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit P to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Q to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit R to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit S to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit T to the Declaration of Andrew May | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 03/22 2:22 PM
Text Entry Order vacating the Text Entry Order setting a HEARING on April 17, 2023 before the Honorable Judge Christina A. Snyder (docket no. 9). The Court denies the MOTION to Vacate FINRA Arbitration Award5 filed March 18, 2023 without prejudice to refiling in accordance with the Local Rules and this Court's Standing Order14 .THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) |
|
14 | 14
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/22 9:36 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
cs_rasgn
Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89)
Tue 03/21 5:28 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-02044 JFW(AFMx). (rn) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/20 11:48 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
11 | 11
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 11:46 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Clerical Error (G-11)
Mon 03/20 11:44 AM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form8 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form7 . Document # 7 and 8 Due to clerical error. The docket clerk docketed the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program and Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge without the judges initials onto forms. (ghap) |
|
9 | 9
textonly
Text Only Notice (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 11:32 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING on PETITION to Vacate or, in the alternative, Modify the Arbitration Award by Clerk of Court. Counsel is hereby notified that the Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 is set for hearing. Motion set for hearing on 4/17/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ghap) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/20 11:11 AM
[NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 3/20/2023, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 10] Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) Modified on 3/20/2023 (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 11:11 AM
[NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 3/20/2023, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 10] NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) Modified on 3/20/2023 (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 11:10 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap) |
|
Saturday, March 18, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Vacate
Sat 03/18 10:43 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate FINRA Arbitration Award filed by Petitioner American Trust Investment Services, Inc.. (Castle, James) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Vacate, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Andrew S. May in Support of Motion to Vacate, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit K to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit P to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Q to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit R to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit S to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit T to the Declaration of Andrew S. May, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit U to the Declaration of Andrew S. May | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Sat 03/18 10:30 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner American Trust Investment Services, Inc., (Castle, James) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Sat 03/18 10:29 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Petitioner American Trust Investment Services, Inc. (Castle, James) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Sat 03/18 10:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner American Trust Investment Services, Inc.. (Castle, James) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Sat 03/18 10:27 PM
PETITION to Vacate or, in the alternative, Modify the Arbitration Award Receipt No: ACACDC-34981051 - Fee: $402, filed by Petitioner American Trust Investment Services, Inc.. (Attorney James C. Castle added to party American Trust Investment Services, Inc.(pty:pet))(Castle, James) |