California Central District Court
Judge:David O Carter
Referred: John D Early
Case #: 8:23-cv-00492
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2023
Terminated:Jun 12, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 6:29 AM PDT
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By
Stephen Finn
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Ernesto Molina
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Defendant
Ted H. Kim
Represented By
Stephen Finn
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Ernesto Molina
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Stephen Finn
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Ernesto Molina
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Defendant
Tracy Renaud
Represented By
Stephen Finn
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Ernesto Molina
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Plaintiff
Jamshid Safarzadeh Markhale
Represented By
Shawn Sedaghat
Shawn S Sedaghat Alc
contact info
Plaintiff
Maral Samadibokharaei
Represented By
Shawn Sedaghat
Shawn S Sedaghat Alc
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Saturday, June 17, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Sat 06/17 4:07 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Oil Oil counsel for Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas. Adding Ernesto Horacio Molina, Jr. as counsel of record for Alejandro Mayorkas et al for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants Alejandro Mayorkas et al. (Attorney Oil Oil added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft))(Oil, Oil)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
11 11 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 06/12 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Jamshid Safarzadeh Markhale, Maral Samadibokharaei. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Sedaghat, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
10 10 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 05/19 9:15 AM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ted H. Kim answer now due 6/26/2023; Ur M. Jaddou answer now due 6/26/2023; Alejandro Mayorkas answer now due 6/26/2023; Tracy Renaud answer now due 6/26/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by defendant Ted H. Kim; Ur M. Jaddou; Alejandro Mayorkas; Tracy Renaud.(Finn, Stephen)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 05/19 9:10 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen Finn counsel for Defendants Ur M. Jaddou, Ted H. Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud. Adding Stephen Finn as counsel of record for Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, et al., for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, et al.. (Attorney Stephen Finn added to party Ur M. Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Finn added to party Ted H. Kim(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Finn added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Finn added to party Tracy Renaud(pty:dft))(Finn, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 03/27 9:36 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/23 9:30 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Ur M. Jaddou, Ted H. Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas and Tracy Renaud. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 03/22 5:58 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 03/22 5:58 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 19, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Sun 03/19 4:27 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Jamshid Safarzadeh Markhale, Maral Samadibokharaei. (Sedaghat, Shawn)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Sun 03/19 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jamshid Safarzadeh Markhale, Maral Samadibokharaei, (Sedaghat, Shawn)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Sun 03/19 4:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jamshid Safarzadeh Markhale, Maral Samadibokharaei. (Sedaghat, Shawn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Sun 03/19 4:24 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34981208 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Maral Samadibokharaei, Jamshid Safarzadeh Markhale. (Attorney Shawn Sedaghat added to party Jamshid Safarzadeh Markhale(pty:pla), Attorney Shawn Sedaghat added to party Maral Samadibokharaei(pty:pla))(Sedaghat, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit #1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit #2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit #3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit #4