Maral Samadibokharaei et al v. Alejandro Mayorkas et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00492 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 12, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 6:29 AM PDT |
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ted H. Kim
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tracy Renaud
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamshid Safarzadeh Markhale
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maral Samadibokharaei
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Saturday, June 17, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Oil Oil counsel for Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas. Adding Ernesto Horacio Molina, Jr. as counsel of record for Alejandro Mayorkas et al for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants Alejandro Mayorkas et al. (Attorney Oil Oil added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft))(Oil, Oil) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Jamshid Safarzadeh Markhale, Maral Samadibokharaei. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Sedaghat, Shawn) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ted H. Kim answer now due 6/26/2023; Ur M. Jaddou answer now due 6/26/2023; Alejandro Mayorkas answer now due 6/26/2023; Tracy Renaud answer now due 6/26/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by defendant Ted H. Kim; Ur M. Jaddou; Alejandro Mayorkas; Tracy Renaud.(Finn, Stephen) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen Finn counsel for Defendants Ur M. Jaddou, Ted H. Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud. Adding Stephen Finn as counsel of record for Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, et al., for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, et al.. (Attorney Stephen Finn added to party Ur M. Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Finn added to party Ted H. Kim(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Finn added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Finn added to party Tracy Renaud(pty:dft))(Finn, Stephen) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Ur M. Jaddou, Ted H. Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas and Tracy Renaud. (jtil) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil) |
|
Sunday, March 19, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Jamshid Safarzadeh Markhale, Maral Samadibokharaei. (Sedaghat, Shawn) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jamshid Safarzadeh Markhale, Maral Samadibokharaei, (Sedaghat, Shawn) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jamshid Safarzadeh Markhale, Maral Samadibokharaei. (Sedaghat, Shawn) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34981208 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Maral Samadibokharaei, Jamshid Safarzadeh Markhale. (Attorney Shawn Sedaghat added to party Jamshid Safarzadeh Markhale(pty:pla), Attorney Shawn Sedaghat added to party Maral Samadibokharaei(pty:pla))(Sedaghat, Shawn) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |