Texas Western District Court
Judge:Xavier Rodriguez
Case #: 5:23-cv-00341
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2023 6:48 AM CDT
Counter Defendant
Ms. Andre Ginnane
Represented By
Charles L. Scalise
Ross & Scalise, P.C.
contact info
Daniel B. Ross
The Ross Law Group
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Boys & Girls Clubs of San Antonio
Represented By
Kelli Cubeta
Cubeta Law Group, LLC
contact info
Elizabeth Assunto Germany
Cubeta Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Boys & Girls Clubs of San Antonio
Represented By
Kelli Cubeta
Cubeta Law Group, LLC
contact info
Elizabeth Assunto Germany
Cubeta Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ms. Andre Ginnane
Represented By
Charles L. Scalise
Ross & Scalise, P.C.
contact info
Daniel B. Ross
The Ross Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
31 31 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 07/23 12:44 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Boys & Girls Clubs of San Antonio. (Cubeta, Kelli)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
30 30 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/21 2:59 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2024 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Jury Selection and Trial set for 11/18/2024 9:00AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, ADR Report Deadline due by 7/1/2024, ADR Mediation Completed by 7/1/2024, Discovery due by 6/17/2024, Motions due by 7/15/2024,. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 03/21 9:56 AM
Text Order GRANTING29 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. An amended scheduling order will issue separately. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (TElc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
29 29 motion Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 03/20 3:57 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Andre Ginnane.(Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
28 28 order Protective Order Thu 12/21 9:01 AM
CONFIDENTIALITY & PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 12/20 11:43 AM
Text Order GRANTING 27 Motion for Protective Order entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The Confidentiality and Protective Order will issue separately. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (TElc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
27 27 motion Protective Order Tue 12/19 10:17 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Confidentiality/Protective Order by Boys & Girls Clubs of San Antonio.(Cubeta, Kelli)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Ex. A - Proposed Protective Order
Monday, October 16, 2023
26 26 answer Answer to Amended Counterclaim Mon 10/16 11:12 AM
ANSWER to20 Amended Counterclaim by Andre Ginnane.(Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
25 25 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 09/28 9:37 AM
ORDER DENYING21 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
24 24 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 09/13 2:09 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Andre Ginnane, re21 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Amended Counterclaim filed by Plaintiff Andre Ginnane (Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
23 23 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 08/30 11:17 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Boys & Girls Clubs of San Antonio, re21 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Amended Counterclaim filed by Plaintiff Andre Ginnane(Cubeta, Kelli)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 17, 2023
22 22 minutes Status Conference Thu 08/17 3:56 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Xavier Rodriguez: Status Conference held on 8/17/2023 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Gigi Simcox.)(tm2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
21 21 motion Dismiss Wed 08/16 4:26 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Amended Counterclaim by Andre Ginnane.(Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
20 20 cmp Amended Counterclaim Tue 08/15 4:02 PM
AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Andre Ginnane amending, filed by Boys & Girls Clubs of San Antonio.(Germany, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 08/15 4:27 PM
Text Order MOOTING17 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss is moot in light of Defendant's First Amended Counterclaim20 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (TLlc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
19 19 misc Proposed Order Tue 08/01 4:46 PM
Proposed Order (Amended) to17 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by Andre Ginnane. (Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Proposed Order Tue 08/01 4:40 PM
Proposed Order to17 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by Andre Ginnane. (Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Dismiss Tue 08/01 4:06 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by Andre Ginnane. (Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 07/27 9:12 AM
Text Order GRANTING16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Counterclaim entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendant's counterclaim is hereby extended to August 7, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (TLlc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Thu 07/27 5:34 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Andre Ginnane answer due 8/7/2023. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 07/25 5:00 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counterclaim by Andre Ginnane.(Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 06, 2023
15 15 order Scheduling Order Fri 07/07 1:51 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2024 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Jury Selection and jury trial set for 9/3/2024 10:30AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, ADR Report Deadline due by 5/1/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 8/15/2023, Discovery due by 4/15/2024, Motions due by 5/15/2024, signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (tm2)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 07/07 1:43 PM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS, (Status Conference set for 8/17/2023 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez.). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (tm2)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 07/06 5:03 PM
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by Andre Ginnane. (Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Thu 07/06 5:00 PM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Andre Ginnane. (Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
11 11 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Wed 07/05 2:54 PM
Defendant's Original ANSWER to10 Amended Complaint of Plaintiff , COUNTERCLAIM against Andre Ginnane by Boys & Girls Clubs of San Antonio.(Cubeta, Kelli)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 06/26 10:57 AM
Text Order MOOTING6 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is moot in light of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint10 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (TLlc)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 06/23 4:05 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boys & Girls Clubs of San Antonio amending, filed by Andre Ginnane.(Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
9 9 misc Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Fri 06/09 1:48 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Andre Ginnane. (Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 06/09 1:45 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Andre Ginnane.(Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 06/09 1:59 PM
Text Order GRANTING8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss6 is hereby extended to June 23, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (TLlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
7 7 9 pgs order Order Mon 06/05 11:21 AM
ORDER AND ADVISORY--It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) as required by Fed. R. Civ. P 26(f) to submit (1) a proposed scheduling order and (2) a Rule 26(f) Report in the formats shown in the attached documents for the Courts consideration by July 6, 2023. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
6 6 motion Dismiss Fri 06/02 11:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Boys & Girls Clubs of San Antonio. (Cubeta, Kelli)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/06 8:11 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andre Ginnane as to Boys & Girls Clubs of San Antonio. Waiver sent on 4/5/2023, answer due 6/5/2023. (Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 03/20 12:28 PM
Summons Issued as to Boys & Girls Clubs of San Antonio. (bc)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Mon 03/20 10:49 AM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Andre Ginnane. (Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 03/20 10:48 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Andre Ginnane. (Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/20 10:46 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17216926), filed by Andre Ginnane.(Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/20 12:25 PM
Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Mon 03/20 12:25 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (bc)
Related: [-]