Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Aidas Joseph Mattis et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Terry J Hatter, Jr |
Referred: | Karen L Stevenson |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02056 |
Nature of Suit | 490 Other Statutes - Cable/Sat TV |
Cause | 47:521 Violations of Cable Communications Act of 1984 |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 06, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 2:40 AM PDT |
Defendant
Lape Ir Suo, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aidas Joseph Mattis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Edita Lipas Mattis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tony Edward Romano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
order
Dismissing Case
Fri 07/07 5:15 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AGAINSTDEFENDANTS AIDAS JOSEPH MATTIS, EDITA LIPAS MATTIS, TONY EDWARD ROMANO, ANDLAPE IR SUO, INC.20 [JS-6] by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between Plaintiff INNOVATIVE SPORTS MANAGEMENT, INC., d/b/a INTEGRATED SPORTS MEDIA and Defendants AIDAS JOSEPH MATTIS, EDITA LIPAS MATTIS, TONY EDWARD ROMANO, and LAPE IR SUO, INC., that the above-entitled action is hereby dismissed with prejudice against AIDAS JOSEPH MATTIS, EDITA LIPAS MATTIS, TONY EDWARD ROMANO, individually and d/b/a THE FOX AND HOUNDS and LAPE IR SUO, INC., an unknown business entity d/b/a THE FOX AND HOUNDS and in its entirety.This dismissal is made pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1).Each Party referenced above shall bear its own attorneys fees and costs. IT IS SO ORDERED. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (shb) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 07/05 10:56 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case Innovative Sports Management, Inc..(Riley, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 06/09 4:32 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: In light of the notice of settlement, filed June 7, 2023, indicating that the case has settled in its entirety, this Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. By JULY 7, 2023 the parties shall file either a proper stipulation and order for dismissal or judgment. Failure to timely file a stipulation and order for dismissal or judgment shall result in the dismissal of this action. All pending hearings and motions are now taken off calendar and vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Settlement
Wed 06/07 1:32 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 05/08 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Lape Ir Suo, Inc., (Fowler, John) |
|
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 05/08 4:42 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Lape Ir Suo, Inc..(Attorney John D Fowler added to party Lape Ir Suo, Inc.(pty:dft))(Fowler, John) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 05/08 4:35 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Edita Lipas Mattis, identifying Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media, F&H, Aidas Mattis, Tony Romano, Livija Lipaite, Aras N. Mattis, Daiva M. Mattis, Daina J. Mattis and Raffi Youssoufian. (Fowler, John) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 05/08 4:31 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Edita Lipas Mattis.(Attorney John D Fowler added to party Edita Lipas Mattis(pty:dft))(Fowler, John) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 05/08 4:24 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Aidas Joseph Mattis, identifying Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media, F&H, Edita Mattis, Tony Romano, Livija Lipaite, Aras N. Mattis, Daiva M. Mattis, Daina J. Mattis and Raffi Youssoufian. (Fowler, John) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 05/08 4:20 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Aidas Joseph Mattis.(Attorney John D Fowler added to party Aidas Joseph Mattis(pty:dft))(Fowler, John) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 05/08 4:13 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Tony Edward Romano, identifying Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media, F&H, Aidas Mattis, Edita Mattis, Livija Lipaite, Aras N. Mattis, Daiva M. Mattis, Daina J. Mattis and Raffi Youssoufian. (Fowler, John) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 05/08 4:05 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Tony Edward Romano.(Attorney John D Fowler added to party Tony Edward Romano(pty:dft))(Fowler, John) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 5:47 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Lape Ir Suo, Inc., Aidas Joseph Mattis, Edita Lipas Mattis, Tony Edward Romano. (car) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/21 5:40 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 5:39 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
6 | 6
textonly
Text Only Cable Case Assignment
Tue 03/21 5:38 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Percy Anderson, Chair of the Case Management and Assignment Committee: Pursuant to General Order 21-01, all related Innovative Sports Management, Inc cases have been assigned to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that are or may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The Related Group Control Number is CV 11-07395 TJH(PLAx). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 5:35 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/20 11:23 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media.(Riley, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 11:13 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media, (Riley, Thomas) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 10:55 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 10:53 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34983694 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Attorney Thomas P Riley added to party Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media(pty:pla))(Riley, Thomas) |