California Central District Court
Judge:Fred W Slaughter
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:23-cv-00498
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2023
Terminated:Aug 07, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 9:48 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Jonathan Russell Blakey
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Diana Westland
LAW OFFICES OF GENE GOLDSMAN 501 W Civic Center Drive Santa Ana
Santa Ana, CA 92701
Represented By
Gene J Goldsman
Law Offices Of Gene Goldsman
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
37 37 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 08/07 1:09 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, having been notified by a Notice of Settlement36 that the case settled, hereby orders this action dismissed without prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction for 30 days to vacate this order and to reopen the action upon showing of good cause that the settlement has not been completed. See document for further information. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice (Other) Wed 08/07 10:38 AM
Notice of Settlement and Joint Request to Vacate All Dates Set in the Case filed by Defendant United States of America. (Blakey, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
35 35 3 pgs order Order Fri 08/02 3:39 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONDUCT DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS AFTER EXPERT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF by Judge Fred W. Slaughter34 . NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY COURT. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
34 34 stip Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date Thu 08/01 5:15 PM
First STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to August 9, 2024 filed by Plaintiff Diana Westland.(Goldsman, Gene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Declaration
Monday, July 15, 2024
33 33 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/15 1:16 PM
ORDER Re Joint Stipulation to Conduct Deposition of Defendant's 30(b)(6) Witnesses After Discovery Cut-Off32 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter, the court ORDERS the court's 6/27/2024, Order Re Joint Stipulation to Conduct Deposition of Defendant's 30(B)(6) Witnesses after Discovery Cut-Off31 MODIFIED as follows (with changes indicated by italics): Jury Trial set for 12/10/2024 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 11/21/2024 at 8:30 AM. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 6/27/2024. Last Date to Hear Mot ions: 8/29/2024. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference: 9/12/2024. Motions in Limine with Proposed Orders: 10/31/2024. Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order: 11/7/2024. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
32 32 3 pgs stip Order Fri 07/12 1:46 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Order TO CONDUCT DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT'S 30(b)(6) WITNESS AFTER DISCOVERY CUT-OFF filed by Defendant United States of America.(Blakey, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jonathan Russell Blakey,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 27, 2024
31 31 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 06/27 12:15 PM
ORDER Re Joint Stipulation to Conduct Deposition of Defendant's 30(b)(6) Witnesses After Discovery Cut-Off30 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter, the court ORDERS the following (with changes indicated by italics): Jury Trial set for 12/10/2024 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 11/21/2024 at 8:30 AM. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 6/27/2024. Last Date to Hear Mot ions: 8/29/2024. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference: 9/12/2024. Motions in Limine with Proposed Orders: 10/31/2024. Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order: 11/7/2024. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
30 30 3 pgs stip Order Wed 06/26 2:49 PM
STIPULATION for Order to Conduct Deposition of Defendant's 30(b)(6) Witnesses After Discovery Cut-Off filed by Defendant United States of America.(Blakey, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jonathan Russell Blakey,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
29 29 order Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 06/05 6:13 PM
ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter DENYING Opposed Ex Parte Application to Modify Existing Scheduling Order27 ; Order Sua Sponte Modifying the November 28, 2023, Scheduling Order. See document for further information. (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
28 28 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Fri 05/31 12:26 PM
OPPOSITION in Opposition re: First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 8/1/202427 filed by Defendant United States of America.(Blakey, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jonathan Russell Blakey with Exh. 1
Thursday, May 30, 2024
27 27 motion Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date Thu 05/30 12:44 PM
First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 8/1/2024 filed by Plaintiff Diana Westland. (Goldsman, Micha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Micha H. Goldsman,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
Thursday, January 04, 2024
26 26 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Thu 01/04 9:11 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Robert A Parris has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
25 25 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Wed 11/29 10:58 AM
ORDER ON PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES (CIVIL CASES) by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
24 24 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/28 12:30 PM
MINUTES SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, having reviewed the pleadings and the parties' submissions pursuant to FRCP 26(f), VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2023, and sets the following schedule: Bench Trial set for 12/10/2024 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 11/21/2024 at 8:30 AM. Last Date to Hear Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties: 1/4/2024. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 5/30/2024. Last Date to Hear Motions: 8/29/2024. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference: 9/12/2024. Motions in Limine with Proposed Orders: 10/31/2024. Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order: 11/7/2024. (See document for further information). (jp) Modified on 11/28/2023 (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 24, 2023
23 23 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 11/24 12:50 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendant United States of America.. (Blakey, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
22 22 notice Appearance Wed 11/15 3:10 PM
First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gene J Goldsman on behalf of Plaintiff Diana Westland (Goldsman, Gene)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 11/15 2:35 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number incomplete; missing initials of Judge. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
20 20 notice Appearance Tue 11/14 9:12 AM
First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gene J Goldsman on behalf of Plaintiff Diana Westland (Goldsman, Gene)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
19 19 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 10/13 10:01 AM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2023 at 9:00 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10/10 2:25 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant United States of America.(Blakey, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
17 17 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 09/06 12:48 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States of America answer now due 10/11/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant United States of America.(Attorney Jonathan Russell Blakey added to party United States of America (pty:dft))(Blakey, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
16 16 misc Declaration Fri 07/28 1:47 PM
DECLARATION of Gene J. Goldsman, Esq. re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 RE: OSC DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION filed by Plaintiff Diana Westland. (Goldsman, Gene)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
15 15 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 06/30 8:53 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION: On June 13, 2023, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution13 . On June 27, 2023, Plaintiff filed a Declaration in Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause14 and informed the Court service of the summons and complaint was not yet effectuated on Defendant. In light of the Plaintiffs response, the Court hereby continues the deadline to July 28, 2023. *Any further response to the Order to Show Cause and any future requests for extension of time must be supported by a declaration stating good cause for such relief.*THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
14 14 misc Declaration Tue 06/27 11:45 AM
DECLARATION of Gene J. Goldsman, Esq. in response to Order to Show Cause Re; Dismissal For Lack of Prosecution filed by Plaintiff Diana Westland. (Goldsman, Gene)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
13 13 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 06/22 9:46 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff's counsel, to show cause in writing no later than June 27, 2023, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff, the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: (see document for further information) (bm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
12 12 service Summons Issued Fri 03/24 1:38 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint1 as to defendant United States of America. (lom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 03/22 11:52 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
10 10 notice Summons Request Tue 03/21 3:47 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by DIANA WESTLAND Diana Westland. (Goldsman, Gene)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Deficiency in Summons Tue 03/21 2:33 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request4 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (sh)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 03/21 2:29 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 03/21 2:29 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 03/21 2:28 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (sh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/20 1:25 PM
AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Diana Westland. (Goldsman, Gene)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 03/20 1:16 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by DIANA WESTLAND Diana Westland. (Goldsman, Gene)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/20 1:14 PM
Signed by Plaintiff Counsel NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Diana Westland Diana Westland, identifying UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Goldsman, Gene)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/20 1:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Diana Westland. (Goldsman, Gene)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/20 1:04 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34985388 - Fee: $402, filed by DIANA WESTLAND Diana Westland. (Attorney Gene J Goldsman added to party Diana Westland(pty:pla))(Goldsman, Gene)
Related: [-]