California Central District Court
Judge:Dolly M Gee
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:23-cv-02061
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2023
Terminated:Jun 15, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 6:16 AM PDT
Defendant
ASI El Monte, LLC
Represented By
David E Karlin
Karlin Law Firm LLP
contact info
L Scott Karlin
Karlin Law Firm LLP
contact info
Defendant
DOES
Plaintiff
Michael Rhambo
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
17 17 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Wed 07/26 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Michael Rhambo. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
16 16 order Dismissing Case Fri 06/16 10:11 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Having considered these factors, the Court concludes that this case is appropriate for dismissal. The Court therefore DISMISSES this action without prejudice under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(b) and 4(m) for failure to prosecute. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (rolm)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Thu 06/15 4:54 PM
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court dismisses the state law claims without prejudice. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
14 14 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Order to Show Cause Wed 06/07 7:59 PM
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before 6/14/2023 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff(s) is due. This action will be dismissed if the document(s) mentioned in this order are not filed by the date indicated above. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
13 13 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 05/05 2:17 PM
First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to ASI El Monte, LLC answer now due 6/4/2023, filed by Defendant ASI El Monte, LLC.(Attorney David E Karlin added to party ASI El Monte, LLC(pty:dft))(Karlin, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
12 12 misc Response Mon 04/10 2:01 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Michael Rhamboto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Order to Show Cause,,,11 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
11 11 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Order to Show Cause Fri 03/31 7:24 AM
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT DECLINE TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim, as well as the Disabled Persons Act, Unfair Competition Act, and negligence claims. In responding to this Order to Show Cause, Plaintiff shall identify the amount of statutory damages Plaintiff seeks to recover. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by 4/10/2023. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim, as well as the Disabled Persons Act, Unfair Competition Act, and negligence claims and the dismissal of any such claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1367(c). Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
10 10 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/23 10:15 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant ASI El Monte, LLC. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
9 9 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Wed 03/22 4:57 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kti)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 03/22 4:56 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 03/22 4:02 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 03/22 4:02 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 03/22 4:01 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 03/20 12:46 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Michael Rhambo. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/20 12:46 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/20 12:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael Rhambo. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/20 12:44 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34985192 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Michael Rhambo(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]