Danxia Teng v. Alejandro Mayorkas
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | R Gary Klausner |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00480 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 27, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 9:03 AM PDT |
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danxia Teng
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, July 27, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 07/27 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Danxia Teng. Dismissal is WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Pickering, Lisa) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 07/21 10:30 AM
Notice DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas.(Bashyrov, Jacob) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of J.Bashyrov, counsel for Defendant | ||
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Wed 06/28 10:49 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/7/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss Case
Wed 06/28 8:42 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas. Motion set for hearing on 8/7/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Bashyrov, Jacob) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration USCIS Lafferty Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration USCIS David Radel Declaration | ||
Saturday, June 17, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Sat 06/17 4:05 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Oil Oil counsel for Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas. Adding Ernesto Horacio Molina, Jr. as counsel of record for Alejandro Mayorkas for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants Alejandro Mayorkas. (Attorney Oil Oil added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft))(Oil, Oil) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 05/10 12:56 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Danxia Teng, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. VELOZ. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to UNKNOWN PERSON. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to UNKNOWN PERSON. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. PLAINTIFF'S(Pickering, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit PROOF OF SERVICE ON ATTORNEY GENERAL, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit PROOF OF SERVICE MAYORKAS, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit USPS CONFIRMATION OF DELIVERY MAYORKAS, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit PROOF OF SERVICE AUSA LOS ANGELES, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit PROOF OF SERVICE AUSA LOS ANGELES | ||
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 05/10 10:48 AM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Alejandro Mayorkas answer now due 7/6/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas.(Bashyrov, Jacob) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
attorney
Attorney Appearance or Reassignment for the USA
Mon 05/08 8:55 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Assistant United States Attorney on behalf of defendant Alejandro Mayorkas. (Attorney Jacob Bashyrov added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft))(Bashyrov, Jacob) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/22 9:18 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 5:10 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/21 5:09 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 5:08 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 5:08 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (lh) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 3:47 PM
PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF DANXIA TENG, (Pickering, Lisa) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/20 3:45 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by PLAINTIFF DANXIA TENG. (Pickering, Lisa) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 3:40 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff DANXIA TENG. (Pickering, Lisa) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 3:02 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34987178 - Fee: $402, filed by PLAINTIFF DANXIA TENG. (Attorney Lisa D Pickering added to party DANXIA TENG(pty:pla))(Pickering, Lisa) |