Mei Wang et al v. Dir LA Asylum Ofc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Shashi H Kewalramani |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00479 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 4:38 AM PDT |
Defendant
Dir LA Asylum Ofc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dir LA Dist
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dir USCIS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sec DHS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
US AG
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
USCIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jingcheng Li
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Xiaoxiong Li
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mei Wang
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiffs Jingcheng Li, Xiaoxiong Li, Mei Wang. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Ye, Ke) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY THE CASE PENDING ADJUDICATION OF APPLICATION18 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. This action until March 8, 2024. If the case is not dismissed by that date, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report and/or Stipulation and Proposed Order as appropriate. (iv) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending ADJUDICATION OF APPLICATION filed by Defendants Dir LA Asylum Ofc, Dir LA Dist, Dir USCIS, Sec DHS, US AG, USCIS.(Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party Dir LA Asylum Ofc(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party Dir LA Dist(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party Dir USCIS(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party Sec DHS(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party US AG(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party USCIS(pty:dft))(Medrano, Alarice) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jingcheng Li, Xiaoxiong Li, Mei Wang, upon Defendant US AG served on 3/28/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke) |
|
16 | 16
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jingcheng Li, Xiaoxiong Li, Mei Wang, upon Defendant Sec DHS served on 3/28/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke) |
|
15 | 15
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jingcheng Li, Xiaoxiong Li, Mei Wang, upon Defendant Dir USCIS served on 3/28/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke) |
|
14 | 14
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jingcheng Li, Xiaoxiong Li, Mei Wang, upon Defendant USCIS served on 3/28/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke) |
|
13 | 13
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jingcheng Li, Xiaoxiong Li, Mei Wang, upon Defendant Dir LA Dist served on 3/24/2023, answer due 5/23/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke) |
|
12 | 12
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jingcheng Li, Xiaoxiong Li, Mei Wang, upon Defendant Dir LA Asylum Ofc served on 3/23/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Statement of Consent filed 3/21/20238 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The document is stricken. (gk) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Lodging8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Form CV-11D should be submitted as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging. The filer has checked the box indicating that ALL Parties have consented to proceed before the selected Magistrate Judge, however, the only signature on the form is that of plaintiffs' counsel. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form6(Ye, Ke) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
7 | 7
![]() 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Dir LA Asylum Ofc, Dir LA Dist, Dir USCIS, Sec DHS, US AG, USCIS. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (lh) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiffs Jingcheng Li, Xiaoxiong Li, Mei Wang. (Ye, Ke) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Ye, Ke) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jingcheng Li, Xiaoxiong Li. (Ye, Ke) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34986833 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiffs Jingcheng Li, Xiaoxiong Li, Mei Wang. (Attorney Ke Ye added to party Jingcheng Li(pty:pla), Attorney Ke Ye added to party Xiaoxiong Li(pty:pla), Attorney Ke Ye added to party Mei Wang(pty:pla))(Ye, Ke) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |