California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 5:23-cv-00479
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 4:38 AM PDT
Defendant
Dir LA Asylum Ofc
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Alarice M Medrano
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Dir LA Dist
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Alarice M Medrano
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Dir USCIS
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Alarice M Medrano
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Sec DHS
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Alarice M Medrano
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
US AG
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Alarice M Medrano
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
USCIS
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Alarice M Medrano
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Jingcheng Li
Represented By
Ke Ye
Mino Law Group Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Xiaoxiong Li
Represented By
Ke Ye
Mino Law Group Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Mei Wang
Represented By
Ke Ye
Mino Law Group Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, March 04, 2024
20 20 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 03/04 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiffs Jingcheng Li, Xiaoxiong Li, Mei Wang. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
19 19 order Staying Case Wed 05/10 3:27 PM
ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY THE CASE PENDING ADJUDICATION OF APPLICATION18 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. This action until March 8, 2024. If the case is not dismissed by that date, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report and/or Stipulation and Proposed Order as appropriate. (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
18 18 stip Stay Case Thu 05/04 1:48 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending ADJUDICATION OF APPLICATION filed by Defendants Dir LA Asylum Ofc, Dir LA Dist, Dir USCIS, Sec DHS, US AG, USCIS.(Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party Dir LA Asylum Ofc(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party Dir LA Dist(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party Dir USCIS(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party Sec DHS(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party US AG(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party USCIS(pty:dft))(Medrano, Alarice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 31, 2023
17 17 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Fri 03/31 1:49 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jingcheng Li, Xiaoxiong Li, Mei Wang, upon Defendant US AG served on 3/28/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Fri 03/31 1:43 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jingcheng Li, Xiaoxiong Li, Mei Wang, upon Defendant Sec DHS served on 3/28/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Fri 03/31 1:41 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jingcheng Li, Xiaoxiong Li, Mei Wang, upon Defendant Dir USCIS served on 3/28/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Fri 03/31 1:39 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jingcheng Li, Xiaoxiong Li, Mei Wang, upon Defendant USCIS served on 3/28/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Fri 03/31 1:36 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jingcheng Li, Xiaoxiong Li, Mei Wang, upon Defendant Dir LA Dist served on 3/24/2023, answer due 5/23/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Fri 03/31 1:35 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jingcheng Li, Xiaoxiong Li, Mei Wang, upon Defendant Dir LA Asylum Ofc served on 3/23/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
11 11 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Tue 03/28 7:07 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Statement of Consent filed 3/21/20238 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The document is stricken. (gk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
10 10 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 03/24 11:17 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Lodging8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Form CV-11D should be submitted as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging. The filer has checked the box indicating that ALL Parties have consented to proceed before the selected Magistrate Judge, however, the only signature on the form is that of plaintiffs' counsel. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 03/22 1:38 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Lodging Tue 03/21 5:24 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form6(Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Consent to Magistrate Judge
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 03/21 4:50 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Dir LA Asylum Ofc, Dir LA Dist, Dir USCIS, Sec DHS, US AG, USCIS. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 03/21 4:48 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 03/21 4:47 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (lh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 03/20 2:50 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiffs Jingcheng Li, Xiaoxiong Li, Mei Wang. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/20 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/20 2:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jingcheng Li, Xiaoxiong Li. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/20 2:47 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34986833 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiffs Jingcheng Li, Xiaoxiong Li, Mei Wang. (Attorney Ke Ye added to party Jingcheng Li(pty:pla), Attorney Ke Ye added to party Xiaoxiong Li(pty:pla), Attorney Ke Ye added to party Mei Wang(pty:pla))(Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit to Complaint