California Central District Court
Case #: 8:23-cv-00499
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2023
Terminated:Mar 22, 2023
Case in other court:Riverside County Superior Court, CVRI2300771
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 4:21 AM PDT
Defendant
FedEx Freight, Inc.
Represented By
Mireya A R Llaurado
Call And Jensen Apc
contact info
Sandra C Isom
Fedex Freight
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Alberto Mora
Represented By
Richard B Rudolph
Rudolph And Chonoles LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
4 4 transfer Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form Wed 03/22 9:32 AM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Shashi H. Kewalramani. New Case Number 5:23-cv-00493 JGB (SHKx). (lh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/20 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FedEx Freight, Inc., identifying FedEx Freight Corporation, a corporation incorporated under the laws of Delaware and FedEx Freight Corporation is a wholly owned subsidiary of FedEx Corporation. (Llaurado, Mireya)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/20 2:51 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FedEx Freight, Inc.. (Llaurado, Mireya)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/20 2:47 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number CVRI2300771 Receipt No: ACACDC-34986423 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FedEx Freight, Inc.. (Attorney Mireya A R Llaurado added to party FedEx Freight, Inc.(pty:dft))(Llaurado, Mireya)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of S. Eslami,
Att: 2 Declaration of D. Woods,
Att: 3 64 pgs Exhibit A to Dec of D. Woods,
Att: 4 Declaration of M. Llaurado,
Att: 5 22 pgs Exhibit 1 (Summons and Complaint) to Dec of M. Llaurado,
Att: 6 Exhibit 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Certificate of Counsel,
Att: 8 ADR Packet,
Att: 9 Exhibit 3 (Defendant's Answer to Complaint) to Dec of M. Llaurado,
Att: 10 Exhibit 4 (Notice of Dept. Assignment) to Dec of M. Llaurado,
Att: 11 Exhibit 5 (Notice of CMC) to Dec of M. Llaurado,
Att: 12 Exhibit 6 (Pltfs Statement of Damages) to Dec of M. Llaurado,
Att: 13 Certificate of Service