Falvey v. Bush et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Robert C Jones |
Referred: | Carla Baldwin |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-00117 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 08, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 4:47 AM PDT |
Defendant
George W. Bush
|
|
Defendant
Dick Cheney
|
|
Defendant
Rumfsfield
|
|
Defendant
William Barr
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530 |
|
Plaintiff
John Thomas Falvey
1041076 Elko County Jail PO Box 2028
Elko, NV 89803 |
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, July 03, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 07/03 3:13 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No.7 Order, addressed to John Thomas Falvey. (DLS) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment
Thu 06/08 2:55 PM
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to ECF No.7 Order. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 6/8/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendation Order Dismissing Case
Thu 06/08 2:53 PM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Baldwin's Report and Recommendation (ECF No.5 ) is ADOPTED and ACCEPTED . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall close this case and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/8/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 06/02 2:05 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable - "Not in Custody" re ECF No.5 Report and Recommendation, addressed to John Thomas Falvey. (DLS) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Report and Recommendation
Fri 05/12 11:42 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS RECOMMENDED that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice; and, IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the Clerk of Court ENTER JUDGMENT accordingly. Objections to R&R due by 5/26/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 5/12/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 04/13 2:45 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable "Not in Custody" re Advisory Letter addressed to John Thomas Falvey. (DLS) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 04/04 11:49 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable - "Not in Custody" re ECF No.2 Order and IFP form with instructions addressed to John Thomas Falvey. (CJS) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/22 10:38 AM
ORDER - Clerk of the Court will SEND Falvey the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by an inmate, as well as the document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application (mailed 3/22/23). On or before Monday, May 8, 2023 , Falvey will either pay the full $402 filing fee or file with the Court: (1) a completed Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, (2) a Financial Certificate properly signed, and (3) a copy of the inmate's prison or jail trust fund account statement for the previous six-month period. The Clerk of the Court will retain the complaint (ECF No.1 -1) but will not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/22/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Receipt Initiating Documents
Wed 03/22 8:37 AM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (DLS) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Tue 03/21 8:05 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (DRM) |