Falvey v. Obama et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | Craig S Denney |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-00118 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 30, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:39 AM PDT |
Defendant
Joe Biden
|
|
Defendant
John Brennon
|
|
Defendant
Jeana Haskel
|
|
Defendant
Barack Hussein Obama
|
|
Plaintiff
John Thomas Falvey
1041076 Elko County Jail PO Box 2028
Elko, NV 89803 |
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 06/15 8:25 AM
Mail Returned as "not in custody" re ECF No.9 Order on Report and Recommendation addressed to John Falvey. (KW) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendation Order Dismissing Case
Tue 05/30 2:29 PM
ORDER - It is ordered that Judge Denney's Report and Recommendation (ECF No.7 ) is accepted and adopted in full . It is further ordered that this action is dismissed without prejudice. It is further ordered that the Clerk of Court close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/30/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 05/23 10:43 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No.7 Report and Recommendation, addressed to John Thomas Falvey. (DLS) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Report and Recommendation
Wed 05/10 1:22 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that the District Judge enter an order DISMISSING this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE and administratively closing this case. Objections to R&R due by 5/24/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 5/10/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 04/28 8:53 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable - "Not in Custody" re ECF No.4 Order addressed to John Thomas Falvey. (CJS) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 04/25 9:55 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF Nos.2 Order,2 -1 IFP form, addressed to John Thomas Falvey. (CJS) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/14 11:08 AM
ORDER - Plaintiff shall file a notice of change of address on or before May 1, 2023 . A failure to comply with this rule may result in dismissal of the action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 4/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 04/13 2:46 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable "Not in Custody" re Advisory Letter addressed to John Thomas Falvey. (DLS) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/31 8:48 AM
ORDER - The Clerk shall SEND Plaintiff a copy of the instructions and application to proceed IFP for an inmate. (IFP form attached for mailing with Order.) Plaintiff has 30 days from the date of this Order to either file his completed IFP application and financial certificate and account statement or pay the full $402 filing fee (5/1/2023). Once Plaintiff has filed his completed IFP application, financial certificate, and account statement or paid the filing fee, the court will screen the complaint as detailed herein. If Plaintiff fails to timely file a completed IFP application and financial certificate or pay the filing fee, this court will recommend dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 3/30/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS) |
|
Att: 1 IFP for inmate form with instructions | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Receipt Initiating Documents
Wed 03/22 8:44 AM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (DLS) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Tue 03/21 8:10 AM
Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (DRM) |