California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Michael R Wilner
Case #: 2:23-cv-02082
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2023
Terminated:Nov 07, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 4:09 AM PDT
Defendant
Charlie's Project Inc.
Represented By
Elliot Brandt Gipson
Elliot Gipson PC
contact info
Brianna Nicole Logan
Elliot Gipson PC
contact info
Defendant
Charlie's Project Kids LLC
Represented By
Elliot Brandt Gipson
Elliot Gipson PC
contact info
Brianna Nicole Logan
Elliot Gipson PC
contact info
Defendant
Anna Hernandez
Represented By
Elliot Brandt Gipson
Elliot Gipson PC
contact info
Brianna Nicole Logan
Elliot Gipson PC
contact info
Defendant
DOES
Plaintiff
Posh Peanut, Inc.
Represented By
Todd Matthew Malynn
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Arash Beral
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Counter Claimant
Charlie's Project Inc.
Terminated: 07/17/2023
Represented By
Brianna Nicole Logan
Elliot Gipson PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Charlie's Project Kids LLC
Terminated: 07/17/2023
Represented By
Brianna Nicole Logan
Elliot Gipson PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Anna Hernandez
Terminated: 07/17/2023
Represented By
Brianna Nicole Logan
Elliot Gipson PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Posh Peanut, Inc.
Terminated: 07/17/2023
Represented By
Todd Matthew Malynn
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Arash Beral
Blank Rome LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
29 29 misc Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120) Tue 11/07 3:03 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (aco)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Judgment
28 28 judgmentCV Judgment Tue 11/07 2:59 PM
JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that: 1. Defendants shall pay the sum of $130,000 to Plaintiff; (See document for further details). (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
27 27 stip Judgment Mon 10/30 6:51 PM
STIPULATION for Judgment as to Stipulation for Entry of Judgment filed by plaintiff Posh Peanut, Inc..(Beral, Arash)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Proposed Judgment
Friday, October 27, 2023
26 26 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 10/27 3:47 PM
IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Court has been informed that the parties are in the process of settlement. The Court declines to vacate the trial date at this time; if the Parties have not settled by 11/27/2023, they should be prepared to go to trial on 11/28/2023. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
25 25 notice Settlement Thu 10/26 7:23 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendants Charlie's Project Inc., Charlie's Project Kids LLC, Anna Hernandez. (Logan, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
24 24 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Thu 07/20 1:18 PM
CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Jury Trial is set for 11/28/2023 at 9:00 AM., with a Pretrial Conference on 11/20/2023 at 3:00 PM. (pc)
Related: [-]
23 23 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 07/20 1:15 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The initial status conference scheduled for 07/24/2023 at 3:00 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. Order to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
22 22 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 07/18 12:19 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
21 21 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 07/17 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Defendants Charlie's Project Inc., Charlie's Project Kids LLC, Anna Hernandez. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Logan, Brianna)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Appearance Mon 07/17 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Brianna Nicole Logan on behalf of Defendants Charlie's Project Inc., Charlie's Project Kids LLC, Anna Hernandez (Logan, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
19 19 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 07/07 4:03 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 7/24/2023 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
18 18 6 pgs order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 06/30 4:17 PM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
17 17 31 pgs answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Counterclaim Mon 06/26 9:39 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against Posh Peanut, Inc. filed by Defendants Charlie's Project Inc., Anna Hernandez, Charlie's Project Kids LLC.(Attorney Brianna Nicole Logan added to party Charlie's Project Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Brianna Nicole Logan added to party Charlie's Project Kids LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Brianna Nicole Logan added to party Anna Hernandez(pty:dft))(Logan, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/11 12:54 PM
Waiver of Service of Summons WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Posh Peanut, Inc.. upon Charlie's Project Kids LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/26/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Brianna N. Logan. (Beral, Arash)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/11 12:52 PM
Waiver of Service of Summons WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Posh Peanut, Inc.. upon Charlie's Project Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/26/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Brianna N. Logan. (Beral, Arash)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/11 12:48 PM
Waiver of Service of Summons WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Posh Peanut, Inc.. upon Anna Hernandez waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/26/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Brianna N. Logan. (Beral, Arash)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
13 13 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 03/29 2:04 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
12 12 notice Appearance Tue 03/28 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Todd Matthew Malynn on behalf of Plaintiff Posh Peanut, Inc. (Malynn, Todd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
11 11 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/23 10:59 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Charlie's Project Inc., Charlie's Project Kids LLC, Anna Hernandez. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Charlies Project Kids LLC,
Att: 2 AHernandez
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 03/23 10:30 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 03/22 5:28 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 03/22 5:27 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 03/22 5:27 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
6 6 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Mon 03/20 4:11 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Posh Peanut. (Malynn, Todd)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/20 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Posh Peanut, (Malynn, Todd)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 03/20 4:08 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Posh Peanut. (Malynn, Todd)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Mon 03/20 4:07 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Posh Peanut. (Malynn, Todd)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Mon 03/20 4:06 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Posh Peanut. (Malynn, Todd)
Related: [-]
1 1 34 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/20 4:01 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34988289 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Posh Peanut. (Attorney Todd Matthew Malynn added to party Posh Peanut(pty:pla))(Malynn, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet