Kimberly Frazier v. 8922 Livonia Holdings, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Mark C Scarsi |
Referred: | Alexander F Mackinnon |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02076 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:18 AM PDT |
Defendant
8922 Livonia Holdings, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Frazier
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 09, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Tue 05/09 4:46 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Frazier. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines
Fri 04/07 12:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER DECLINING SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION. The Court has reviewed the Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause13 . The Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs Unruh Act and any other construction-related accessibility claim. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. (lc) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Response
Wed 04/05 2:47 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Frazierto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive-form only-no proceeding held11 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
adr
Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)
Wed 03/22 10:34 AM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (smo) |
|
11 | 11
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held
Wed 03/22 10:33 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Order to Show Cause (ADA) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 4/5/2023. (smo) |
|
10 | 10
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held
Wed 03/22 10:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Order re Prosecution of Certain Cases Under the Americans With Disabilities Act by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) |
|
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/22 10:24 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 6:13 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant 8922 Livonia Holdings, LLC. (car) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/21 6:06 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 6:06 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 6:06 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/20 3:37 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Kimberly Frazier. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 3:34 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 3:33 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Frazier. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 3:31 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-34987682 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Kimberly Frazier(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |