Forough Ababaei et al v. Antony J. Blinken et al
California Central District Court | |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02085 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 2:55 AM PDT |
Defendant
Jeffry L. Flake
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Antony J. Blinken
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Merrick Garland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Forough Ababaei
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zahra Ahmadi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Autumn D. Spaeth. New Case Number 8:23-cv-00516-JVS-ADSx. (car) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Forough Ababaei, Zahra Ahmadi.(Emerick, Scott) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying none known at this time. (Emerick, Scott) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Forough Ababaei, Zahra Ahmadi. (Emerick, Scott) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34988913 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Forough Ababaei, Zahra Ahmadi. (Attorney Scott A Emerick added to party Forough Ababaei(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Emerick added to party Zahra Ahmadi(pty:pla))(Emerick, Scott) |