California Central District Court
Case #: 2:23-cv-02085
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2023
Terminated:Mar 22, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 2:55 AM PDT
Defendant
Jeffry L. Flake
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Defendant
Antony J. Blinken
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Defendant
Merrick Garland
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Plaintiff
Forough Ababaei
Represented By
Scott A Emerick
Bolour Carl Immigration Group Apc
contact info
Scott A. Emerick
Bolour Carl Immigration Group Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Zahra Ahmadi
Represented By
Scott A Emerick
Bolour Carl Immigration Group Apc
contact info
Scott A. Emerick
Bolour Carl Immigration Group Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
5 5 transfer Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form Wed 03/22 9:14 AM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Autumn D. Spaeth. New Case Number 8:23-cv-00516-JVS-ADSx. (car)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 03/20 4:33 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Forough Ababaei, Zahra Ahmadi.(Emerick, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Summons Defendant Flake,
Att: 2 Supplement Summons Defendant Garland
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/20 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying none known at this time. (Emerick, Scott)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/20 4:30 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Forough Ababaei, Zahra Ahmadi. (Emerick, Scott)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/20 4:29 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34988913 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Forough Ababaei, Zahra Ahmadi. (Attorney Scott A Emerick added to party Forough Ababaei(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Emerick added to party Zahra Ahmadi(pty:pla))(Emerick, Scott)
Related: [-]